This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2020 at 03:12:39 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., ET AL. VS. EASTER M. MARTINEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2016 U S BANK TRUST, N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against EASTER M MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8607

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR

Defendants

DOES 1-10

CAPITAL ONE SERVICES INC.

FIRST REGIONAL BANK

MARTINEZ-JACKSON EASTER M.

JMJ FINANCIAL GROUP

THE LIPKIN FAMILY TRUST

OPTION ONE REALTY INC.

KISH MARIE S.

MARTINEZ EASTER M.

LIPKIN HOWARD TRUSTEE

FIRST CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY-DOE 1

SERVO PAUL G.

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATAYRON NICOLAS

Defendant Attorney

MAY MICHAEL DENNIS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Judicial Notice

3/1/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/3/2016: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

6/20/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

6/20/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Default Entered

7/24/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Default Entered

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION,

8/29/2017: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION,

Other - - OTHER - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING - CMC - MICHAEL D. MAY, ESQ.

11/8/2017: Other - - OTHER - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING - CMC - MICHAEL D. MAY, ESQ.

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

11/27/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-12-07 00:00:00

12/7/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-12-07 00:00:00

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-12-08 00:00:00

12/8/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-12-08 00:00:00

Minute Order

12/8/2017: Minute Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/25/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

3/28/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

Other - - OTHER - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING - NICOLAS MATAYRON

5/17/2018: Other - - OTHER - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING - NICOLAS MATAYRON

Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference)

12/7/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/1/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

3/1/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/1/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute or Default Judgment Pursuant Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 585) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute or...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (in Responsed to 03/12/19 OSC); Filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketApplication (for Entry of Default Judgment); Filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-04-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-04-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less