Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 15:55:41 (UTC).

ULLICO CASUALTY COMPANY VS KENNETH CONTRERAS ET-AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2012 ULLICO CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KENNETH CONTRERAS ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1511

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ULLICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendants

WESTRUX INTERNATIONAL INC.

UNITED RENTALS NORTH AMERICA INC.

UNITED RENTALS (ERRONEOUSLY SUED)

CONTRERAS KENNETH

WESTERN INTERNANTIONAL

UNITED RENTALS ERRONEOUSLY SUED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GUILFORD STEINER SARVAS & CARBONARA

ADELSON TESTAN BRUNDO & JIMENEZ

Defendant Attorney

SUTTON & MURPHY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT

3/26/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

4/4/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

4/5/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

4/19/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF THOMAS M. MURPHY; IPROPOSEDI ORDER A....,O)FL `FT1

8/5/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF THOMAS M. MURPHY; IPROPOSEDI ORDER A....,O)FL `FT1

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF ULLICO CASUALTY COMPANY RE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

8/14/2013: DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF ULLICO CASUALTY COMPANY RE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

8/28/2013: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

RULING

8/30/2013: RULING

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

9/26/2013: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE; REQUEST FOR FEES, COSTS AND SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00; DECLARATION OF KRISANN S. KUROSU; [

12/27/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE; REQUEST FOR FEES, COSTS AND SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00; DECLARATION OF KRISANN S. KUROSU; [

Minute Order -

2/5/2014: Minute Order -

ORDER RE: DEFENDANT UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC. (1) MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; (2) MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

2/5/2014: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC. (1) MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; (2) MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

NOTICE OF RULING

2/10/2014: NOTICE OF RULING

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF FROM MAKING A CLAIM FOR SPECIAL DAMAGES; IPROPOSEDI ORDER

2/20/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF FROM MAKING A CLAIM FOR SPECIAL DAMAGES; IPROPOSEDI ORDER

STATEMENT OF CASE

2/20/2014: STATEMENT OF CASE

PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

2/20/2014: PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

Minute Order -

2/27/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING

3/4/2014: NOTICE OF RULING

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 93; Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition (Motion-Compel Deposition; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department LA93, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; Final Status Conference (request for dismissal filed2-25-14) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (without prejudice, entire action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2012
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ULLICO CASUALTY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO UNITED RENTALS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ULLICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where United Rentals, Inc, is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTRUX INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant