This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2015 at 00:31:13 (UTC).

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS JOHN MCGONIGLE ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/23/2010 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Controlled Substance/Drug Eviction lawsuit against JOHN MCGONIGLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES R. DUNN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0274

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Controlled Substance/Drug Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES R. DUNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

MCGONIGLE FAMILY PARTNERSHIP THE

MCGONIGLE JOHN

MCGONIGLE JOHN F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUNNINGHAM FRANCIS J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

6/23/2010: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

6/25/2010: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

7/15/2010: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

7/15/2010: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

7/15/2010: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

7/28/2010: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

7/28/2010: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

12/14/2010: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

12/14/2010: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

DECLARATION OF STEVEN F. KUEHL IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

1/4/2011: DECLARATION OF STEVEN F. KUEHL IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

1/13/2011: ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

MINUTE ORDER

2/16/2011: MINUTE ORDER

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

3/10/2011: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/28/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/20/2011: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

[PLD] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SET[ING DEFA(JLT PROVE-UP HEARING

5/4/2011: [PLD] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SET[ING DEFA(JLT PROVE-UP HEARING

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

6/29/2011: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR JUDECIAL NOTICE OF MATTERS AND DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT ON VERIFIED COMPLA[NT

6/29/2011: REQUEST FOR JUDECIAL NOTICE OF MATTERS AND DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT ON VERIFIED COMPLA[NT

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2011
  • Exhibit (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • Request to Enter Judgment Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • Brief (SUMMARY OF CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • Default Judgment Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • Order (CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • Declaration (in support to continue case management conf. 5/31/11 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • Default Entered (JOHN MCGONIGLE AKA JOHN F. MC- GONIGLE, A SINGLE MAN; JOHN MCGONIGLE, AS GENERAL PARTNER OF THE MCGONGLE FAMILY Partnership a limited partnership, The McGon- igle family partnership, a ltd) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2010
  • Declaration (of non service ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • Declaration (of non service ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • Declaration (OF NON SERVICE JOHN MCGONIGLE, AS GENRAL PARTNER OF THE MCGONIGLE FAMILY PARTNERSHI P, A LTD PARTNERSHIP ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • Declaration (of non service ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • Declaration (OF NON SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • Declaration (OF NON SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • Notice (of pendency of action ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

II/RC/ 9B

DEF.JM.wpd

S 2w N

dCENED

L N % 1 ‘10\\

gpT. 2°

JUN 29 2011 TLED

kS SUPERIOR COURT

JOI’H Joan s Be B bimey VI-L—;RK

t?u. RRNUAL» gy S. ONTIVEROS, DEPUTY

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF( CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION,

SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION AS RECEIVER FOR DOWNEY SAVINGS AND LOAN

ASSOCIATION, F.A,,

Plaintiff, VS.

JOHN MCGONIGLE aka JOHN F.

MCGONIGLE, a single man; JOHN MCGONIGLE, as general partner of The McGonigle Family Partnership, a limited partnership; THE MCGONIGLE FAMILY PARTNERSHIP, a limited partnership; AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE

PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO THE

PLAINTIFF’S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF’S TITLE THERETO, NAMED AS

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive,

Defendants.

] JUDGMENT BY

COURT|AFTER DEFAULT ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

e e s el ——— e b . —— i e— — - —