Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 06:17:22 (UTC).

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS 5805 SEPULVEDA PARTNERS

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 5805 SEPULVEDA PARTNERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN L. SEGAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2267

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN L. SEGAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

5805 SEPULVEDA PARTNERS

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELIN CRAIG A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE; ETC

10/28/2011: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE; ETC

SUMMONS -

10/28/2011: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

11/4/2011: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/18/2011: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

11/18/2011: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

2/8/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

2/9/2012: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Docketat 3:37 PM in Department 50; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 50; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less