This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2021 at 04:57:29 (UTC).

TYRONE M HUNTER JR VS GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/20/2010 TYRONE M HUNTER JR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN A. KRONSTADT, COLEMAN A. SWART and WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7950

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN A. KRONSTADT

COLEMAN A. SWART

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUNTER TYRONE M. JR.

Defendants

ADAMS RANDY

DEPOMPA RONALD

DOES 1 TO 100

EDEY RAYMOND

FOX BRUCE

GLENDALE CITY OF

GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT

HALAULAKOS LOUIS

MARCHMAN MARIO

POVILAITIS CARL

ROCK MICHAEL

DEPARTMENT GLENDALE POLICE

Not Classified By Court

LERMAN GLENN E. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MAURER ANN M. SR.

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF TIGRAN TOPADZIHKYAN, IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMAR JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMA1Y ADJUDICATION

3/10/2011: DECLARATION OF TIGRAN TOPADZIHKYAN, IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMAR JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMA1Y ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF CRAIG SNYDER, PH.D., IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMAKY ADJUDICATION

3/10/2011: DECLARATION OF CRAIG SNYDER, PH.D., IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMAKY ADJUDICATION

PROPOSED JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

3/18/2011: PROPOSED JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

JOINT AGREED UPON JURY INSTRUCTIONS

3/18/2011: JOINT AGREED UPON JURY INSTRUCTIONS

DEFENDANTS OBWCTIONS TO DECLARATION OF TYRONE HUNTER SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION IFILED CONCURRENTLY WITH REPLY TO OPPOSIT

3/18/2011: DEFENDANTS OBWCTIONS TO DECLARATION OF TYRONE HUNTER SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION IFILED CONCURRENTLY WITH REPLY TO OPPOSIT

DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF CRAIG SNYDER, PH.D., QME SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION IFILED CONCURRENTLY WITH REPL

3/18/2011: DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF CRAIG SNYDER, PH.D., QME SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION IFILED CONCURRENTLY WITH REPL

PRO.OF79J ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

3/25/2011: PRO.OF79J ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

4/1/2011: JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

Minute Order -

4/1/2011: Minute Order -

MEMO COSTS SUMMARY -

4/14/2011: MEMO COSTS SUMMARY -

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • Docketat 08:00 AM in Department 78; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketMEMO COSTS SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 78; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
144 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • DocketPLAINTIFF TYRONE M. HUNTER, .JR.S FIRST AMENIWD COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: (1) INTENTIONAL DISCRIMINATION ON THE BASES OF RACE NATIONAL ORIGIN, AND ATIKESTRY IN VIOLATION OF FEHA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • DocketPLAINTIFF TYRONE M. HUNTER, JRS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: (1) INTENTIONAL DISCRIMINATION ON THE BASES OF RACE, NATIONAL ORIGIN AND ANCESTRY IN VIOLA1ION OF FEHA; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tyrone M. Jr. Hunter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT GLENDALE POLICE is a litigant

Latest cases where Glendale Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAURER ANN MARIE