This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 01:44:25 (UTC).

TWIN MED LLC VS CYPRESS GARDENS CARE CENTER

Case Summary

On 11/29/2016 TWIN MED LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CYPRESS GARDENS CARE CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1904

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TWIN MED LLC

Defendants and Respondents

9025 COLORADO AVENUE LLC

DOES 1 TO 50

CYPRESS GARDENS CARE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ABRAMSON MICHAEL A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

11/29/2016: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

SUMMONS

11/29/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/15/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/20/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

3/14/2017: Unknown

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/14/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/29/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/29/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

3/29/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/3/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/23/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT PACKAGE; AND RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF CASE

6/23/2017: DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT PACKAGE; AND RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF CASE

Minute Order

6/26/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/3/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 28; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Twin Med, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 28; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Twin Med, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT PACKAGE; AND RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Twin Med, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 28; (OSC-Failure to File Request Ent of Def; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Twin Med, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Twin Med, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWIN MED LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABRAMSON MICHAEL A.