This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 00:01:34 (UTC).

TWIN MED LLC VS BINA BHATIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/15/2015 TWIN MED LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against BINA BHATIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7834

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TWIN MED LLC

Defendants and Respondents

BHATIA BHAGVATI

BHATIA BINA

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

INTEGRATED NURSING AND REHAB CARE OF PER-

MAKANDURA LAKSHMAN DR.

SHARMA VATSALA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF ARYEH KAUFMAN

MICHAEL A. ABRAMSON ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ALKANA EUGENE S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/16/2018: Minute Order

JUDGMENT

9/17/2018: JUDGMENT

SUMMARY OF CASE FOR COURT'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT LAKSHMAN MAKANDURA AFTER DEFAULT, AN ETC

9/17/2018: SUMMARY OF CASE FOR COURT'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT LAKSHMAN MAKANDURA AFTER DEFAULT, AN ETC

SUMMONS

10/15/2015: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/19/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

10/19/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/6/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/6/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/6/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT)

1/6/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/2/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

4/12/2016: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF TWIN MED, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT VATSALA SHARMA'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; ETC

4/27/2016: PLAINTIFF TWIN MED, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT VATSALA SHARMA'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; ETC

REPLY MEMORANDUM TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ETC

5/4/2016: REPLY MEMORANDUM TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ETC

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

5/10/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

RULING RE: DEFENDANTS VATSALA SHARMA'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT.

5/10/2016: RULING RE: DEFENDANTS VATSALA SHARMA'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT.

Minute Order

3/28/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/10/2017: Minute Order

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; (OSC-Failure to File Request Ent of Def; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Twin Med, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • SUMMARY OF CASE FOR COURT'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT LAKSHMAN MAKANDURA AFTER DEFAULT, AN ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Default Judgment; Filed by Twin Med, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Twin Med, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • at 09:02 AM in Department 61; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • PLAINTIFF TWIN MED, LLC COMPLAINT FOR: 1) SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST LIABILITY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Twin Med, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC597834    Hearing Date: March 8, 2021    Dept: 61

Plaintiff and Judgment Creditor Twinmed, LLC’s Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant and Judgment Debtor Dr. Lakshman Makandura is GRANTED in the amount of $2,666.76.

Plaintiff to provide notice.

“The court may impose a monetary sanction ordering that one engaging in the misuse of the discovery process, or any attorney advising that conduct, or both pay the reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred by anyone as a result of that conduct.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.030, subd. (a).)

Twinmed moves for monetary sanctions against judgment debtor Makandura on the grounds that despite this court’s July 6, 2020 order compelling responses to interrogatories, no responses have been provided. (Abramson Decl. ¶ 5.) Twinmed asks for $5,916.76 in sanctions, representing nine hours of attorney time at $650 per hour associated with this motion, plus $66.76 in filing and travel expenses. (Abramson Decl. ¶ 10.)

This court ordered that responses be provided, and notice of its ruling was served upon Makandura on July 6, 2020. That Makandura has not provided responses is evidence of misuse of the discovery process.

The court notes that no opposition has been filed, meaning that the $1,300.00 claimed to reply to the opposition cannot be awarded. Also, the five hours claimed to draft the motion is excessive. Two hours is more appropriate for this relatively simple motion, leading to another deduction of $1,950. The court awards $2,666.76 in sanctions for this motion.

Case Number: BC597834    Hearing Date: July 06, 2020    Dept: 61

Plaintiff and Judgment Creditor Twinmed, LLC’s Motion to Compel Answers to Post-Judgment Special Interrogatories, Set One, from Defendant and Judgment Debtor Dr. Lakshman Makandura is GRANTED. Answers are ordered within 20 days. Sanctions are awarded against Makandura in the amount of $1,950, as well as a $60 filing fee.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTEGRATED NURSING AND REHAB CARE OF PER- is a litigant

Latest cases where TWIN MED LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALKANA EUGENE STEVEN