This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:06:15 (UTC).

TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC VS MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD AND MARTON

Case Summary

On 06/25/2015 TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD AND MARTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6290

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TWAROWSKI EUGENE III

TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC

Defendants and Respondents

CHILD & MARTON LLP

CHILD BRADFORD

DOES 1 THROUGH 300

MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WLA LEGAL SERVICES INC.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CHILD BRADFORD T. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/29/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/28/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER OF CHILD & MARTON LLP AND BRADFORD CHILD TO COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATORY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/16/2015: ANSWER OF CHILD & MARTON LLP AND BRADFORD CHILD TO COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATORY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/23/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

10/5/2015: Minute Order

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE OF DEFENDANTS CHILD, ET AL.; DECLARATION OF STEVEN ZELIG

7/13/2016: OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE OF DEFENDANTS CHILD, ET AL.; DECLARATION OF STEVEN ZELIG

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE

7/25/2016: OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE

RULING RE: (1) DEFENDANT BRADFORD CHILD'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A CONTEMPT SANCTION, AND; ETC.

8/4/2016: RULING RE: (1) DEFENDANT BRADFORD CHILD'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A CONTEMPT SANCTION, AND; ETC.

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FSC BY 2-3 COURT DAYS; DECLARATION OF STEVEN ZELIG

8/4/2016: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FSC BY 2-3 COURT DAYS; DECLARATION OF STEVEN ZELIG

SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATENG SANCTIONS, REFLECTING PLAINTIFFS' SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS AND PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF STEVEN ZELIG

8/4/2016: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATENG SANCTIONS, REFLECTING PLAINTIFFS' SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS AND PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF STEVEN ZELIG

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES BY DEFENDANTS BRADFORD CHILD AND CHILD & MARTON, LLP ;DECLARAT1ON OF STEVEN ZELIG;

9/6/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES BY DEFENDANTS BRADFORD CHILD AND CHILD & MARTON, LLP ;DECLARAT1ON OF STEVEN ZELIG;

Minute Order

12/19/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/8/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/1/2017: DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order

3/23/2017: Minute Order

SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/10/2017: SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF APPEAL

6/1/2017: NOTICE OF APPEAL

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

7/12/2017: APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • Memorandum (Memorandum of Costs on Appeal); Filed by CHILD & MARTON, LLP (Defendant); BRADFORD CHILD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B282941); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice of Designation of Record; Filed by TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC (Plaintiff); Eugene III Twarowski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Notice of Appeal; Filed by TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
188 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • RESPONSE TO OSC RE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Response; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC (Plaintiff); Eugene III Twarowski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATORY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON is a litigant

Latest cases where CHILD & MARTON LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILD BRADFORD T. ESQ.