Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2021 at 16:34:25 (UTC).

TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC ET AL VS CASKEY & HOLZMAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/11/2014 TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CASKEY HOLZMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL, GREGORY W. ALARCON, MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6049

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

GREGORY W. ALARCON

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TWAROWSKI EUGENE III

TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC

Defendants

CASKEY & HOLZMAN

CASKEY & HOLZMAN INC.

CASKEY MARSHALL

CASKY & HOLZMAN

DOROGI THOMAS

HOLZMAN DANIEL

LOSH & KHOSHLESAN LLP

MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON INC.

CHILD BRADFORD

KHOSHLESAN JOSEPH

LOSH STEPHEN

DOES 1-300

CHILD & MARTON LLP

MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON

Cross Plaintiff

CASKEY MARSHALL A.

Not Classified By Court

BREZINGER ELLA

BREZINGER BORIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ZELIG STEVEN L. ESQ.

WEST LA LEGAL SERVICES INC.

ZELIG STEVEN

Defendant Attorneys

COLLINS COLLINS MUIR + STEWART LLP

LOSH & KHOSHLESAN LLP

CHILD & MARTON LLP

SHOECRAFT DEVIN T. ESQ.

SHOECRAFT DEVIN THOMAS

BURTON MICHELLE L. ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CASKEY & HOLZMAN

Not Classified By Court Attorney

OBAGI ZEIN E. JR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Twarowski Pacific, LLC (Plaintiff); Eugene Twarowski, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Dismissal for failure to bring to trial within 5 years? (CCP 583.310)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Pursuant to Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Twarowski Pacific, LLC (Plaintiff); Eugene Twarowski, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Twarowski Pacific, LLC (Plaintiff); Eugene Twarowski, III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Pursuant to Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (ISO Exclude or Limit Claims By Plaintiff Eugene Twarowski, III Individually)); Filed by Losh & Khoshlesan, LLP (Defendant); Stephen Losh (Defendant); Joseph Khoshlesan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
535 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATORY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON is a litigant

Latest cases where TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CHILD & MARTON LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBAGI ZEIN E