This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 18:45:20 (UTC).

TSUN CHEN KUNG, ET-AL VS JOHN MATHEW SALGADO, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 08/31/2012 TSUN CHEN KUNG, ET-AL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN MATHEW SALGADO, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIA WEINBACH and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1828

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIA WEINBACH

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KUNG TSUN CHEN

HUNG PETER

HUNG STEVEN HAO-YUAN

HUNG JOHNSON HAO-CHIANG

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DUARTE RAMON

DUARTE YOLANDA

SALGADO JOHN MATHEW

Not Classified By Court

CARTER PAUL JEFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG J. JAY LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CLASEN RAFFALOW & RHOADS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/11/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

9/10/2013: Minute Order -

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO EXCLUDE ACTUAL OR POTENTIAL DOLLAR AMOUNTS OF DAMAGES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO EXCLUDE ACTUAL OR POTENTIAL DOLLAR AMOUNTS OF DAMAGES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF?S OR DEFENDANT?S FINANCIAL CONDITION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF?S OR DEFENDANT?S FINANCIAL CONDITION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO EXCLUDE ANY TESTIMONY OF THE PLAINTIFF WHICH IS SPECULATIVE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO EXCLUDE ANY TESTIMONY OF THE PLAINTIFF WHICH IS SPECULATIVE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #5 TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM PROVIDING ANY EXPERT ACCIDENT RECONSTRUCTION, BIOMECHANICAL OR MEDICAL TESTIMONY; ETC.

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #5 TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM PROVIDING ANY EXPERT ACCIDENT RECONSTRUCTION, BIOMECHANICAL OR MEDICAL TESTIMONY; ETC.

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #13 TO EXCLUDE CLAIMS OF PROPERTY DAMAGE BASED ON PRIOR SETTLEMENT OF PROPERTY DAMAGE PORTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [P

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #13 TO EXCLUDE CLAIMS OF PROPERTY DAMAGE BASED ON PRIOR SETTLEMENT OF PROPERTY DAMAGE PORTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [P

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #10 FOR PERMISSION TO USE DEMONSTRATIVE EVIDENCE BEFORE ADMISSION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #10 FOR PERMISSION TO USE DEMONSTRATIVE EVIDENCE BEFORE ADMISSION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #11 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OR CLAIMS NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PR

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #11 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OR CLAIMS NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PR

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #6 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM REFERRING TO INVOICES, BILLS AND RECIEPTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #6 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM REFERRING TO INVOICES, BILLS AND RECIEPTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #7 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS BETWEEN ANY OF THE PARTIES TO THIS ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PR

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #7 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS BETWEEN ANY OF THE PARTIES TO THIS ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PR

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #8 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR COST OF REPAIRS TO PROPERTY DAMAGE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CH1RINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #8 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR COST OF REPAIRS TO PROPERTY DAMAGE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CH1RINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #9 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF THE TRAFFIC COLLISION REPORT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #9 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF THE TRAFFIC COLLISION REPORT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #12 TO LIMIT PLAINTIFF?S RECOVERY OF SPECIAL DAMAGES TO THOSE * DAMAGES ACTUALLY INCURRED; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPO

8/19/2013: DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE #12 TO LIMIT PLAINTIFF?S RECOVERY OF SPECIAL DAMAGES TO THOSE * DAMAGES ACTUALLY INCURRED; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CHIRINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPO

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/25/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2013
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by TSUN CHEN KUNG (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE X-COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHN MATHEW SALDAGO; RAMON DUARTE AND YOLANDA DUARTE ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department LA91, Elia Weinbach, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (FSC=09-10-13TD=09-24-13) - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • DocketMotion in Limine (#7 to preclude evidence of settlement negotiations between any of the parties to this action ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • DocketMotion in Limine; Filed by JOHN MATHEW SALGADO (Legacy Party); RAMON DUARTE (Legacy Party); YOLANDA DUARTE (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #8 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR COST OF REPAIRS TO PROPERTY DAMAGE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GUY CH1RINIAN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO YOLANDA DUARTE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO RAMON DUARTE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO JOHN MATHEW SALGADO ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by TSUN CHEN KUNG (Legacy Party); PETER HUNG (Plaintiff); STEVEN HAO-YUAN HUNG (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less