This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 09:50:36 (UTC).

TRTON SP. Z O.O. VS. SHOPSMARTSSP, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2016 TRTON SP Z O O filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHOPSMARTSSP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAURICE A. LEITER and BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8433

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAURICE A. LEITER

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TROTON SP. Z O.O.

O.O. TROTON SP. Z

Defendants

SHOPSMARTSSP INC. A CALIFIORNIA

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALAN L. BRODKIN & ASSOCIATES

BRODKIN ALAN LEE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/10/2016: Complaint

Summons

5/10/2016: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/10/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/10/2016: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document

6/6/2016: Legacy Document

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/9/2016: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Legacy Document

8/22/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

8/22/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

8/22/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

8/22/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

8/22/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

9/9/2016: Legacy Document

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

9/29/2016: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Minute Order

1/10/2017: Minute Order

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

12/14/2017: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

4/2/2018: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

6/29/2018: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Minute Order

10/30/2018: Minute Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Application and Order for Appearance and Examination]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by TROTON SP. Z O.O. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Order to Appear for Examination (of shopsmartssp, inc., kasra vahmi, authorized person ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by TROTON SP. Z O.O. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department A; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • at 09:00 am in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Judgment Debtor Examination (OF SHOPSMARTSSP, INC.) - No appearance(s), off calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Minute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Order to Appear for Examination (OF SHOPSMARTSSP, INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default (AS TO SHOPSMARTSSP, INC. REJECT- ADDRESS LISTED DEFAULT DOES NOT MATCH P.O.S ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by TROTON SP. Z O.O. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by TROTON SP. Z O.O. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TROTON SP. Z O.O. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: TC028433    Hearing Date: August 06, 2020    Dept: A

# 7. Troton SP. Z O.O. v. Shopsmartssp, Inc.

Case No.: TC028433

Matter on calendar for: Motion for Assignment Order

Tentative ruling:

  1. Background

    Plaintiff Troton SP. Z O.O. extended credit on an open book account to defendant Shopsmartssp, Inc. Defendant then failed to remit necessary payment. On September 9, 2016, Troton obtained a judgment against Shopsmartssp.

    Troton has determined that Shopsmartssp has a website through which it conducts online business. It now moves the Court for an order assigning any and all proceeds to Troton.

    The motion is unopposed.

    For the reasons set forth below, the Court denies the motion without prejudice.

  2. Standard

    Code of Civil Procedure § 708.510 empowers the court to assign a judgment creditor all or part of a right to certain payments due or to become due. (C.C.P., § 708.510(a).) The court considers all relevant factors, including but not limited to:

  1. The reasonable requirements of a judgment debtor who is a natural person and of persons supported in whole or in part of the judgment debtor.

  2. Payments the judgment debtor is required to make or that are deducted in satisfaction of other judgments and wage assignments, including earnings assignment orders for support

  3. The amount remaining due on the money judgment.

  4. The amount being or to be received in satisfaction of the right to payment that may be assigned.

(C.C.P., § 708.510(c).) The amount to be assigned cannot exceed the money judgment. (C.C.P., § 708.510(d).

  1. Analysis

    The judgment amount is $91,976.73. Troton seeks the assignment of all credit card payments made to Shopsmartssp from its customers on its website. Plaintiff’s counsel declares that Troton “is informed and believes” that that Shopsmartssps is conducting business via an online store. (Decl. Brodkin, ¶ 5.) Allegations on information and belief are inadequate to establish the claimed facts. (San Francisco Newspaper Printing Co. v. Superior Court (1985) 170 Cal.App.3d 438, 442.) Troton must supply the Court with additional information and admissible evidence detailing what is known about Shopsmartssp’s website and related activities to justify the order requested.

  2. Ruling

    The motion for an assignment order is denied without prejudice.

    Next dates:

    Notice: