This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2015 at 00:05:15 (UTC).

TROYER CONTRACTING COMPANY, INC. VS. AMERICANA AT BRAND, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/25/2008 TROYER CONTRACTING COMPANY, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AMERICANA AT BRAND, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8013

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TROYER CONTRACTING COMPANY INC.

Defendants

AMERICANA AT BRAND LLC

AMERICANA HOMES LLC

AMERICANA HOUSING L.P.

FOREFRONT BUILDERS CORPORATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAGNER PALMER PC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2009
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • DocketDeclaration (OF DAVID C. PALMER RE SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS AND STATUS OF RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • DocketNotice (OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY FIRM NAME ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • DocketProof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • DocketProof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2008
  • DocketProof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICANA HOUSING L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOREFRONT BUILDERS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TROYER CONTRACTING COMPANY. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant