This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 11:09:04 (UTC).

TRINIDAD SERRANO VS ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST, LLC.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2010 TRINIDAD SERRANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAUL A. SAHAGUN and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7219

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SERRANO MARIO

SERRANO TRINIDAD

Defendants

ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC

SERRANO MICHAEL

ENSIGN FACILITY SERVICES INC.

WHITTIER HILLS HEALTH CARE CENTER

FLAGSTONE GROUP INC. THE

ENSIGN GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANZONE MORGAN LLP

Defendant Attorney

MURCHISON & CUMMING LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2011
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department C; (Motion to Compel; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department C, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ, Presiding; Motion to Compel (TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TOREQ.FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS;) - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • DocketOrder (RE 7/22/11 HEARING ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by TRINIDAD SERRANO (Plaintiff); MARIO SERRANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION W PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST,LLC DBA WHITTIER HILLS HEALTH CARE CTR TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; GRANTED; HEARD JUNE 24, 2011); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO THE FLAGSTONE GROUP, INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO ENSIGN FACILITY SERVICES, INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TRINIDAD SERRANO (Plaintiff); MARIO SERRANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SIGNUM HEALTHCARE SOUTH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ENSIGN SERVICES INC is a litigant