This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 19:23:31 (UTC).

TRINIDAD FRICK VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2012 TRINIDAD FRICK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, GREGORY KEOSIAN, WILLIAM BARRY, ELIA WEINBACH and ADR CLERK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6792

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

WILLIAM BARRY

ELIA WEINBACH

ADR CLERK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRICK TRINIDAD

Defendants

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

DOES 1 TO 100

MARINERS PARK VILLAGE HOA (GFS GTD)

Not Classified By Court

FOX ROBERT P.

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN DAVID S. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

THE LEE LAW GROUP PC

COLLINS COLLINS MUIR & STEWART LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

4/4/2014: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BIFURCATE OR SEVER ALL CLAIMS FOR WHICH MARINERS PARK VILLAGE HOA MAY BE HELD LIABLE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND

8/21/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BIFURCATE OR SEVER ALL CLAIMS FOR WHICH MARINERS PARK VILLAGE HOA MAY BE HELD LIABLE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND

NOTICE AND EX PARTE MOTION FOR EARLIEST POSSIBLE TRIAL DATE

8/29/2014: NOTICE AND EX PARTE MOTION FOR EARLIEST POSSIBLE TRIAL DATE

Minute Order

7/3/2014: Minute Order

COUNTRY OF LOS ANGELES' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF TRINIDAD FRICK'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/5/2013: COUNTRY OF LOS ANGELES' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF TRINIDAD FRICK'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

OPPOSITION TO COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES MOTION IN L1MINE 4

4/8/2014: OPPOSITION TO COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES MOTION IN L1MINE 4

EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DAVID S. BROWN

12/1/2014: EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DAVID S. BROWN

Unknown

5/16/2013: Unknown

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE ANY MEDICAL EXPENSES/HO WELL DAMAGES; ETC

3/27/2014: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE ANY MEDICAL EXPENSES/HO WELL DAMAGES; ETC

STIPULATION TO ALLOW COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? FILING OF CROSSCOMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFF?S FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/3/2013: STIPULATION TO ALLOW COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? FILING OF CROSSCOMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFF?S FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

7/9/2013: NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? COMPENDIUM OF EXIFIBITS IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MARINERS PARK VILLAGE HOA?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF TRINIDAD FRICK?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/21/2014: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? COMPENDIUM OF EXIFIBITS IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MARINERS PARK VILLAGE HOA?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF TRINIDAD FRICK?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

STIPULATION TO ALLOW COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? FILING OF CROSS-COMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFF?S FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/29/2013: STIPULATION TO ALLOW COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? FILING OF CROSS-COMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFF?S FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CROSS COMPLAINT

8/21/2013: SUMMONS CROSS COMPLAINT

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL; DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA KRASOVEC; STIPULATION AND IPROPOSEDI ORDER

7/3/2013: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL; DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA KRASOVEC; STIPULATION AND IPROPOSEDI ORDER

EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW K. NASH, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/7/2014: EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW K. NASH, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order

12/26/2013: Minute Order

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY TO DEPOSE RICHARD FIGUEROA AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MARINERS VILLAGE PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION AND COUNSEL IN THE AMOU

6/9/2014: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY TO DEPOSE RICHARD FIGUEROA AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MARINERS VILLAGE PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION AND COUNSEL IN THE AMOU

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2015
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (w/prej, complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Ex-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Reply/Response (TO OSC HRG AND OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S EXPARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MARINERS PARK VILLAGE HOA ON 08/21/13 FOR A MUTUAL WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS; NOT TO ACT AS A RETRAXIT AS TO MARINERS PARK VILLAGE HOA ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Notice (OF OSC; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Ex-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EARLIEST POSSIBLE TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (COUNTER STATEMENT RE: OSC; ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (deposit of jury fees ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • Notice (of posting jury fees ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.