Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 10:21:19 (UTC).

TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP LLC VS 603 SAN FERNANDO ROAD LLC

Case Summary

On 03/16/2015 TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 603 SAN FERNANDO ROAD LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL and MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5588

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP LLC

Defendants and Respondents

603 SAN FERNANDO ROAD LLC

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FREIDMAN & FEIGER LLP

SCALI LAW FIRM THE

SCALI CHRISTIAN J. ESQ.

SELIK EVAN M. ESQ.

CESTERO RICARDO P. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LANDSBERG IAN S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/13/2018: Minute Order

TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP, LLC?S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ? RENT ABATEMENT; ETC

3/16/2015: TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP, LLC?S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ? RENT ABATEMENT; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

9/10/2015: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

9/11/2015: AMENDED NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

9/16/2015: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS

11/2/2015: RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS

PROOF OF DELIVERY

3/22/2016: PROOF OF DELIVERY

RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

4/11/2016: RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

REQUEST FOR REFUND

6/14/2016: REQUEST FOR REFUND

DECLARATION OF EVAN M. SELIK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH THE SUBPOENAS F EX PARTE APPLICIATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH CURRENTLY SET TO BE HEARD

7/5/2016: DECLARATION OF EVAN M. SELIK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH THE SUBPOENAS F EX PARTE APPLICIATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH CURRENTLY SET TO BE HEARD

Minute Order

7/5/2016: Minute Order

REPLY IN SUPPORT MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH THE SUBPOENAS FOR INSURANCE RECORDS TO UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY AND MOUNT VERNON FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

8/8/2016: REPLY IN SUPPORT MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH THE SUBPOENAS FOR INSURANCE RECORDS TO UNIVERSAL UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY AND MOUNT VERNON FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF THE CALIFORNIA STATE BAR'S RECEIPT OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICANT JASON H. FRIEDMAN'S RESIDENCE

4/7/2017: NOTICE OF THE CALIFORNIA STATE BAR'S RECEIPT OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICANT JASON H. FRIEDMAN'S RESIDENCE

PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF CASEY DONOYAN TN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S CLOSING BRIEF

4/27/2017: PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF CASEY DONOYAN TN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S CLOSING BRIEF

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

6/6/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN SCALI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS

10/17/2017: DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN SCALI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS

DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN SCALI IN SUPPORT OF PLANTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS

10/17/2017: DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN SCALI IN SUPPORT OF PLANTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS

DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS; DFCLARATIONS OF IAN S. LANDSBERG AND CASEY Z DONOYAN

12/4/2017: DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS; DFCLARATIONS OF IAN S. LANDSBERG AND CASEY Z DONOYAN

111 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Tricolor Auto Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 51; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Tricolor Auto Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS CVOUNSEL-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Tricolor Auto Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
214 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2015
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Tricolor Auto Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Tricolor Auto Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • NOTICE OF ERRATA TO PLAINTIFF TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP, LLC'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Tricolor Auto Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP, LLCS COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT RENT ABATEMENT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Tricolor Auto Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC575588    Hearing Date: July 30, 2020    Dept: 51

Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees is granted in part. The Court will not include in its award the $6775 requested for hours needed for a reply to an opposition because no opposition was filed and counsel need not appear in person at the hearing. 

The Court hears motions for attorney fees on a regular basis.  It finds that $10,737 for preparation of the instant motion is excessive and that $5,737 is a more a reasonable amount.  

Accordingly, attorney fees are awarded in the amount of $52,823 ($64,598 minus $6775 minus $5000), payable within 45 days.  

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANDSBERG IAN SCOTT