This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:56:09 (UTC).

TRICOAST BUILDERS, INC. VS. NATHANIEL FONNEGRA

Case Summary

On 09/10/2015 TRICOAST BUILDERS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATHANIEL FONNEGRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN P. PFAHLER and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6615

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

TRICOAST BUILDERS INC.

Defendants and Respondents

FONNEGRA NATHANIEL

HOUSER & ALLISON APC

G.D. BACA INC.

FSB CENLAR

WHITEHOUSE CONSTRUCTION INC.

PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL LLC

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONNETTE LAW OFFICE

Defendant Attorneys

ACTION LEGAL TEAM

JONATHAN R. HICKMAN ESQ.

WRIGHT FINLAY & ZAK LLP

HACKER LAW GROUP

STYLES BOBBIE N.

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document

3/18/2016: Legacy Document

Other -

9/7/2017: Other -

Legacy Document

11/13/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

11/27/2017: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

1/24/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

2/5/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

4/11/2018: Legacy Document

General Denial

4/16/2018: General Denial

Legacy Document

5/3/2018: Legacy Document

Notice of Ruling

5/21/2018: Notice of Ruling

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

8/17/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Case Management Statement

9/25/2018: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order

11/28/2018: Stipulation and Order

Declaration

2/13/2019: Declaration

Proof of Personal Service

2/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Opposition

5/9/2019: Opposition

Minute Order

5/10/2019: Minute Order

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

5/31/2019: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

193 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Stay the Proceedings); Filed by NATHANIEL FONNEGRA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for Hearing Date on Motion to Stay Proceedings; Filed by TRICOAST BUILDERS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • at 08:35 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (To Continue Trial); Filed by TRICOAST BUILDERS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Appeal - Court Reporter Waiver of Transcript Deposit (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by TRICOAST BUILDERS, INC. (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
266 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2016
  • Notice; Filed by NATHANIEL FONNEGRA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Other - (Civil Deposit); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by NATHANIEL FONNEGRA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by NATHANIEL FONNEGRA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Answer; Filed by NATHANIEL FONNEGRA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TRICOAST BUILDERS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Notice (of All Purpose Case Assignment and Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: PC056615    Hearing Date: September 14, 2020    Dept: F47

Dept. F-47

Date: 9/14/20

Case #PC056615

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Motion filed on 3/11/20.

MOVING ATTORNEY: Jeffrey A. Hacker and Hacker Law Group

CLIENT: Defendant Nathaniel Fonnegra

NOTICE: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order relieving Jeffrey A. Hacker and Hacker Law Group as counsel for Defendant Nathaniel Fonnegra in this action.

RULING:

The proposed order does not include the client’s phone number or address as required in number 6. Once the foregoing information is provided, the motion will be granted.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G.D. BACA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSER & ALLISON is a litigant

Latest cases where Tricoast Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant