This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2019 at 12:10:11 (UTC).

TRESHUNDA JUDDINE VS DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Case Summary

On 11/19/2015 TRESHUNDA JUDDINE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DOES 1 THROUGH 100. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0599

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JUDDINE TRESHUNDA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

MD. MICHAEL J. DAWSON

PRIME HEALTHCARE CENTINELA LLC

LU YIN MD. DOE7

M.D. ARMEN HOVHANNISYAN

ST. JOHN'S WELL CHILD & FAMILY CNTR INC.

Guardian Ad Litem

BARKER KRISHAWNNA A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN C. GAMBARDELLA

Defendant Attorneys

TROTTER MICHAEL J. ESQ.

MORALYAN EMMA

BRANDMAYER KENT T. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF CARMEN VIGIL RE: ASSIGNMENT OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

3/2/2018: DECLARATION OF CARMEN VIGIL RE: ASSIGNMENT OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DR. YINS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

7/19/2018: NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DR. YINS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

Minute Order

12/19/2018: Minute Order

Opposition

3/14/2019: Opposition

Declaration

4/3/2019: Declaration

Request for Judicial Notice

4/12/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Summary Judgment

4/12/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Opposition

5/28/2019: Opposition

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

6/11/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Opposition

6/17/2019: Opposition

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/14/2016: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/21/2016: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/23/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/3/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF FIRM ADDRESS CHANGE

3/15/2017: NOTICE OF FIRM ADDRESS CHANGE

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE, FSC, AND TRIAL-RELATED DATES.

4/3/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE, FSC, AND TRIAL-RELATED DATES.

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT PRIME HEALTHCARE CENTINELA LLA DBA CENTINELA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4/4/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT PRIME HEALTHCARE CENTINELA LLA DBA CENTINELA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

4/10/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • Reply (to Opposition); Filed by LU YIN MD. DOE7 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by ARMEN HOVHANNISYAN M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDENT YU LIN'S MSJ, DEC OF GAMBARDELLA, DEC OF SHAW M.D.; P& A, EXHIBITS); Filed by Treshunda Juddine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by MICHAEL J. DAWSON MD. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Robert Bruce Packer, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Separate Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Treshunda Juddine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Opposition (to motion for summary judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Separate Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Opposition (PLAINTIFF OPP TO LIN MSJ); Filed by Treshunda Juddine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
181 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Treshunda Juddine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM C1VIL IEXPART -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Treshunda Juddine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC600599    Hearing Date: January 05, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

TRESHUNDA JUDDINE, by and through her GUARDIAN AD LITEM, KRISHAWNNA A. BARKER,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC600599

[TENTATIVE] ORDER TAKING PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINOR OFF-CALENDAR

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

January 5, 2021

 

Plaintiff, Treshunda Juddine, by and through her guardian ad litem, Krishawnna A. Barker, filed this action against Defendants Does 1 through 100 for medical negligence. The complaint alleges that on 10/01/15, Plaintiff presented to Defendants for care and treatment of abscessed teeth, but Plaintiff’s condition deteriorated and resulted in cardiorespiratory arrest, causing brain injury and leaving Plaintiff in a comatose condition.

Plaintiff filed the complaint on 11/19/15. On 2/10/20, the matter was called for trial. There were no appearances by any party or counsel, so the court dismissed the action without prejudice. On 8/05/20, Plaintiff filed an Ex Parte Application for Orders Setting Aside the Dismissal. Plaintiff provided the parties reached a settlement in December 2019, but Plaintiff’s counsel neglected to file a Notice of Settlement. Further, Plaintiff’s counsel asserted it was research and preparing a Petition for Establishment of Special Needs Trust, and a Petition for Compromise of the Claim of a Dependent Adult. The court vacated the 2/10/20 dismissal and set a hearing for Petition to Confirm Compromise with Special Needs Trust for 1/02/21. (Min. Order 8/05/20 Min. Order.) Moreover, because the action would be pending for over 5 years by this date, counsel was advised Plaintiff would need to address the 5-year statute prior to filing the petition.

As of 12/29/20, Plaintiff has not filed any petition to confirm compromise. Therefore, the court takes the instant hearing on petition to confirm compromise off-calendar. The court sets an OSC Re: Status of Petition to Confirm Compromise for __________________.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 5th day of January, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIME HEALTHCARE CENTINELA LLC DBA CENTINELA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. JOHN'S WELL CHILD AND FAMILY CENTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORALYAN EMMA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDMEYER KENT THOMAS