This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 07:19:29 (UTC).

TREASURE BONES, LLC VS ARCHSTONE DISTRIBUTION, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/18/2016 TREASURE BONES, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against ARCHSTONE DISTRIBUTION, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8586

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TREASURE BONES LLC

Defendant

ARCHSTONE DISTRIBUTION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEIK SHAHROKH

Defendant Attorney

GIBALEVICH & ASSOCAIATES LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2016
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • at 08:31 am in Department WEK, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding; Petition Confirm Arbitration Award (CONTRACTUAL) - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (PARTY SERVED - DONALD V. SMILEY ); Filed by Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Notice of Hearing (ON PETITION AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; DECLARATION OF SHAHROKH SHEIK; [PROPOSED ORDER] ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCHSTONE DISTRIBUTION LLC is a litigant