This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 05:12:33 (UTC).

TRAVELERS PROPERT CASUALTY CO OF AMERICA VS ANNING-JOHNSON C

Case Summary

On 03/06/2015 TRAVELERS PROPERT CASUALTY CO OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANNING-JOHNSON C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4733

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TREVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF

Defendants and Respondents

ANNING-JOHNSON COMPANY

BEN F. SMITH INC.

CITY COMMERCIAL PLUMBING INC.

COSCO FIRE PROTECTION INC.

JEZOWSKI & MARKEL CONTRACTORS INC.

LAWRENCE B. BONAS COMPANY

O'BRYANT ELECTRIC INC.

SMITH BEN F.

WEISS SHEET METAL COMPANY

SME STEEL CONTRACTORS

Cross Defendants

DBA BONAS COMPANY

BONAS LAWRENCE B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGUILER LAW GROUP APLC THE

Defendant Attorneys

BRAASCH DEBRA L. ESQ.

GRAY GARY S. ESQ.

BROWN TIMOTHY W.ESQ

CANNON CATHERINE M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

3/6/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF-DUTY TO DEFEND; ETC

3/6/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF-DUTY TO DEFEND; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/18/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER OF SME STEEL CONTRACTORS, INC. TO COMPLAINT

4/7/2015: ANSWER OF SME STEEL CONTRACTORS, INC. TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/7/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/7/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/7/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/7/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/7/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/7/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/7/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITY COMMERCIAL PLUMBING, INC, TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

4/15/2015: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITY COMMERCIAL PLUMBING, INC, TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/7/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/7/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/8/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DEFENDANT, O'BRYANT ELECTRIC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA

5/13/2015: DEFENDANT, O'BRYANT ELECTRIC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Unknown

5/15/2015: Unknown

Unknown

5/15/2015: Unknown

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2016
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 55; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketPartial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by Trevelers Property Casualty Company of (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Trevelers Property Casualty Company of (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Trevelers Property Casualty Company of (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Trevelers Property Casualty Company of (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketANSWER OF SME STEEL CONTRACTORS, INC. TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF-DUTY TO DEFEND; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Trevelers Property Casualty Company of (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/1975
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAWRENCE B. BONAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BEN F. SMITH INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JEZOWSKI & MARKEL CONTRACTORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where O'BRYANT ELECTRIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant