Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2016 at 15:41:25 (UTC).

TRACEY RIVERA VS. MYTHO FELIX, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2009 TRACEY RIVERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MYTHO FELIX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSE HOM, LAW & MOTION and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3732

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSE HOM

LAW & MOTION

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERA TRACEY

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FELIX MYTHO

FELIX VENTURES INC.

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

THE POINT INSURANCE COMPANY

FELIX VENTURES INC.

NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MONARCH E&S INSURANCE SERVICES

INDIO PRODUCTS INC.

THE POINT INSURANCE COMPANY

CLASSICPLAN PREMIUM FINANCING INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 10

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

BARRAGAN MARIA D.

FELIX VENTURES INC.

NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Not Classified By Court

NAUTILUS INSURANCE GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF DEACON A. LADASZ

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF LORNA C. WASHINGTON

GEORGE JEFF A. THE LAW OFFICE OF

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BOLENDER & ASSOCIATES

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR LAW OFFICE

Cross Defendant Attorney

MESERVE MUMPER & HUGHES LAW OFFICES OF.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2012
  • Partial Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • Notice (OF REJECTION FOR REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, NO CROSS-COMPLAINT HAVE BEEN DISMISSED CANNOT FILE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • Amendment to Cross-Complaint (ROE 4 - INDIO PRODUCTS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Demurrer (TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT BY NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY; DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMO- RANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ) Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • Order (ON NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY'S DEMURRER TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF THE POINT INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • Declaration (DECLARATION OF LORNA C. WASHINGTON RE BANKRUPTCY ) Filed by Former Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
169 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2010
  • Declaration (OF DEACON A. LADASZ FOR OSC HEARING FOR FAILURE TO FILE A PROOF OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • Declaration (OF DEACON A. LADASZ FOR OSC HEARING FOR FAILURE TO FILE A PROOF OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Summons Filed (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Summons Issued (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2009
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2009
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2009
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDIO PRODUCTS INC. AKA INDIO PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT is a litigant

Latest cases where NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant