This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2021 at 21:00:36 (UTC).

TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC VS. PAUL E. SCHOENBAUM

Case Summary

On 09/08/2009 TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PAUL E SCHOENBAUM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET L. OLDENDORF. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6338

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET L. OLDENDORF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS LLC

Defendant

SCHOENBAUM PAUL E. DDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KANOWSKY & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F46; (Order to Show Cause; Default Judgment - By Declaration) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F46, Margaret L. Oldendorf, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) - Default Judgment - By Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • DocketDeclaration (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CARL J. KANOWSKI IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFLT JUDGMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F46; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; OSC Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F46, Margaret L. Oldendorf, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - OSC Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2010
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2010
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2009
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Request to Enter Default; REJECTED) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • Docketin Department A1135, CLERK, Presiding; Request to Enter Default (SECTION 1b, NAME OF PLAINTIFF DOESNOT MATCH ANYONE NAME IN THE CASEAND SECTION 5 CCP 585.5 NOT CMPLET) - REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (REJECTED - SECTION 1b NAME OF DECLARANT DOES NOT MATCH THE NAMES ON THE COMPLAINT AND SECTION 5 CCP585.5 WAS LEFT BLANK ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (RE: SUMMONS SERVED PAUL E. SCHOENBAUM, DDS, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION BY PERSONALLY SERVING SCHOENBAUM ON 9/9/09 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS LLC is a litigant