This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2021 at 23:20:17 (UTC).

TOP GUN LTD VS THE BREAKERS AT WESTPORT CONDO HOMEOWNERS

Case Summary

On 09/30/2014 TOP GUN LTD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE BREAKERS AT WESTPORT CONDO HOMEOWNERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9124

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TOP GUN LTD.

Defendants and Respondents

ALLENSTEIN ROY

ANDERSON JUDY

BREAKERS AT WESTPROT CONDOMINIUM

CHARBONNIER BRIAN

CLASSIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

LEE SILVIA

SVEHLAK STEVEN

SVEHLAK WENDY

ZELLS MICHAEL A.

EDWARDS GEOFF

SIPPY NARINA

KIECKHAFER JEFFREY A.

GANS SHANNON

PUSHKIN DAVID L.

REED MARTY

LAWRENCE ROBERT

OH STEVE

LEVY YAON

SIMMONS PATRICIA

49 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FRANCESCHI LAW CORPORATION

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ADAMS KESSLER PLC

LOGAN MICHAEL J. ESQ.

PLC ADAMS KESSLER

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

9/30/2014: SUMMONS -

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE TO EASEMENT BY PRESCRIPTION AND FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

9/30/2014: VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE TO EASEMENT BY PRESCRIPTION AND FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

9/30/2014: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

9/30/2014: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. DEENIHAN

10/8/2014: OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. DEENIHAN

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE FILING OF A DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS; OR AN ORDER RELATING THE CASE

10/9/2014: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE FILING OF A DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS; OR AN ORDER RELATING THE CASE

NOTICE OF EX PARTE MOTION AND EX PARTE MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING RELATION/CONSOLIDATION OF CASES AND/OR DEMURRER; ETC

10/9/2014: NOTICE OF EX PARTE MOTION AND EX PARTE MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING RELATION/CONSOLIDATION OF CASES AND/OR DEMURRER; ETC

Minute Order -

10/9/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

10/10/2014: Minute Order -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

10/24/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/24/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING ACTION FOR 90 DAYS PENDING COMPLETION OF ADR MEDIATION

11/3/2014: STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING ACTION FOR 90 DAYS PENDING COMPLETION OF ADR MEDIATION

Minute Order -

11/3/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

11/3/2014: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/3/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

OT1CE OF STIPULATION AND ORDER I) STAYING ACTION UNTIL AFFER IAN UARY 25, 2015 PENDING DOMPLETION OF ADR MEDIATION I LVTRRJNRR RIV RIM

11/6/2014: OT1CE OF STIPULATION AND ORDER I) STAYING ACTION UNTIL AFFER IAN UARY 25, 2015 PENDING DOMPLETION OF ADR MEDIATION I LVTRRJNRR RIV RIM

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY CONTACT INFORMATION

11/14/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY CONTACT INFORMATION

Minute Order -

1/26/2015: Minute Order -

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; (OSC RE Dismissal; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 72; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Top Gun, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Breakers at Westprot Condominium (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING REGARDING OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; (OSC RE Dismissal; Proceeding continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Breakers at Westprot Condominium (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • DocketOPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. DEENIHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE TO EASEMENT BY PRESCRIPTION AND FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Top Gun, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Top Gun, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Top Gun, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BREAKERS AT WESTPORT CONDOMINIUM HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TOP GUN LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLASSIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant