This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 23:49:11 (UTC).

TOP GUN LLC VS CITY OF HAWTHORNE ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 TOP GUN LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITY OF HAWTHORNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0452

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TOP GUN LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

HAWTHORNE AIRPORT LLC

HAWTHORNE CITY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FRANCESCHI LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

5/1/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND CONSTRUCTIVE EVICTION

5/1/2015: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND CONSTRUCTIVE EVICTION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/5/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2015
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND CONSTRUCTIVE EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Top Gun, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hawthorne Airport, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TOP GUN LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where HAWTHORNE CITY OF is a litigant