This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 16:08:42 (UTC).

TONYA HUMES VS RONDIE LATHAM

Case Summary

On 09/14/2015 TONYA HUMES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RONDIE LATHAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0825

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HUMES TONYA

HALL JEFFREY

RVN ENTERPRISES INC.

PECC ENTERPRISES

ROES 1 THROUGH 30

Defendants and Cross Defendants

HALL JEFFREY

LATHAM RONDIE

RVN ENTERPRISES INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LATHAM RONDIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF STRATTON S. BARBEE

RING LAURENCE

MANNING MARDER KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ LLP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

RING LAURENCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by TONYA HUMES (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department B; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department B, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference (J/T - 9/26/17) - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by TONYA HUMES (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 11; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2015
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by RONDIE LATHAM (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Notice of Motion (TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by RONDIE LATHAM (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.