This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 08:20:22 (UTC).

TONY ECHEVARRIA VS LUIS MIGUEL ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/31/2015 TONY ECHEVARRIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LUIS MIGUEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9941

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ECHEVARRIA TONY

VERA TONY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-50

HICKS CHRISTIAN BROYLES

KING OF LATIN POP

MIGUEL LUIS

WARNER MUSIC LATINA INC.

MIGUEL LUIS (AKA LUIS MIGUEL GALLEGO

GREEN WILLIE ALLEN (DOE 1)

ARABDZHYAN MIKE

CEASER CAMERA JULIO (DOE 3)

GREEN WILLIE ALLEN DOE 1

MIGUEL LUIS AKA GALLEGO

CEASER CAMERA JULIO DOE 3

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MASTROIANNI LAW FIRM

EKPENISI MACAULEY

FIRM OCEANBRIDGE LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

VICKI GRECO ESQ.

GRECO VICKI ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/26/2017: Minute Order

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

10/15/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

11/10/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. ASSAULT; 2. BATTERY; ETC

4/19/2016: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. ASSAULT; 2. BATTERY; ETC

DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/21/2016: DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S DEPOSITION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOLLY R. COATES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/8/2017: DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S DEPOSITION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF HOLLY R. COATES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF LUIS MIGUEL, OR IN ALTERNATIVE, ADVANCE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER OR SHORTEN THE TIME WITHIN WHICH TO HEAR THE MOTION; ETC

5/26/2017: EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF LUIS MIGUEL, OR IN ALTERNATIVE, ADVANCE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER OR SHORTEN THE TIME WITHIN WHICH TO HEAR THE MOTION; ETC

DECLARATION OF MACAULEY EKPENISI, RE: TELEPHONIC NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING THE APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL OR IN ALTERNATIVE ADVANCE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECT

5/26/2017: DECLARATION OF MACAULEY EKPENISI, RE: TELEPHONIC NOTICE OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING THE APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL OR IN ALTERNATIVE ADVANCE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECT

DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/20/2017: DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING AS ADMITTED, PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC.

6/22/2017: DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING AS ADMITTED, PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC.

REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING AS ADMITTED, PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS SENT TO DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST

6/28/2017: REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING AS ADMITTED, PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS SENT TO DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST

MOTION IN LJMINE NO. 5 DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE IRRELEVANT AND PREJUDICIAL "REPTILE THEORY"; ETC.

7/12/2017: MOTION IN LJMINE NO. 5 DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE IRRELEVANT AND PREJUDICIAL "REPTILE THEORY"; ETC.

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE IMPROPER OPINION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL CONDITIONS AND RESTRICTIONS; ETXC.

7/12/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4 DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE IMPROPER OPINION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL CONDITIONS AND RESTRICTIONS; ETXC.

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I TO LIMIT PLAINTIFF'S RECOVERY OF MEDICAL SPECIAL DAMAGES TO AMOUNT PAID BY OR ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF;ETC.

7/12/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I TO LIMIT PLAINTIFF'S RECOVERY OF MEDICAL SPECIAL DAMAGES TO AMOUNT PAID BY OR ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF;ETC.

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM NON- DESIGNATED WITNESSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

7/12/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM NON- DESIGNATED WITNESSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTFIER CLAIMS OR LAWSUITS AGAINST DEFENDANT; ETC.

7/12/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 DEFENDANT LUIS MIGUEL'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTFIER CLAIMS OR LAWSUITS AGAINST DEFENDANT; ETC.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

7/17/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Minute Order

7/20/2017: Minute Order

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • at 08:34 AM in Department M; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • at 08:32 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by TONY ECHEVARRIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-10-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Opposition; Filed by KING OF LATIN POP (Legacy Party); LUIS (AKA GALLEGO) MIGUEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Default Entered; Filed by TONY VERA (Legacy Party); TONY ECHEVARRIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • at 08:31 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
216 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2015
  • 1. ASSAULT 2. BATTERY 3. NEGLIGENT SUPER VISION/ RESPONDEAT SUPERIOR AGAINST DEFENDANT MIGUEL 4. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by TONY ECHEVARRIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Warner Music Latina Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRECO VICKI