This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:10:16 (UTC).

TONI HENDERSON VS REDONDO BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/01/2015 TONI HENDERSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against REDONDO BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3395

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HENDERSON TONI

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

REDONDO BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YUN & SIMONIAN PC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GIBEAUT GARY ROBERT ESQ.

MEYERS NEAL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT ARID HOUSING ACT; ETC

9/1/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT ARID HOUSING ACT; ETC

SUMMONS

9/1/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/14/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINTIPETITION FOR ALTERNATIVE WRIT OF MANDATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/2/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINTIPETITION FOR ALTERNATIVE WRIT OF MANDATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/2/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

10/6/2015: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/6/2015: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

10/6/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT

FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/13/2015: FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/29/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/3/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/9/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/10/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

2/10/2016: NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT; (2) FAILURE TO PROVIDE REASONABLE DISABILITY ACCOMMODATION IN VIOLATION OF T

2/22/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT; (2) FAILURE TO PROVIDE REASONABLE DISABILITY ACCOMMODATION IN VIOLATION OF T

NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE OFF-CALENDAR

2/24/2016: NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE OFF-CALENDAR

Minute Order

2/25/2016: Minute Order

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT REDONDO BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

3/1/2016: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT REDONDO BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Redondo Beach Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45; (OSC RE Dismissal; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 45; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 45; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE CIV1L

    Read MoreRead Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Redondo Beach Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Redondo Beach Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Demurrer; Filed by Redondo Beach Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINTIPETITION FOR ALTERNATIVE WRIT OF MANDATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Toni Henderson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT ARID HOUSING ACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDONDO BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A LOCAL EDUCATION AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIBEAUT GARY ROBERT ESQ.