This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2016 at 22:01:13 (UTC).

TOLUCA LAKE VILLAS VS VENTURA CONSTRUCTION ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/01/2014 TOLUCA LAKE VILLAS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against VENTURA CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ, JOHN P. DOYLE and RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3297

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

JOHN P. DOYLE

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOLUCA LAKE VILLAS INC.

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AMOS WATERPROOFING & SURFACING INC.

AYALA ALFONSO MEDINA

FRANK MARRONE & SONS INC.

GENERAL SHEET METAL

JMS A/C & HEATING INC.

LAMY DAN

MITCHELL ENVIRONMENTAL CONCRETE INC.

S.B.B. CORPORATION

VALDEZ SIMON JIMENEZ

VENTURA CONSTRUCTION INC.

LIRI DEVELOPMENT INC.

DAN LAMY

MORALES WATERPROOFING

DARIUSH LAMY

E-KO DRYWALL

JOEL MORALES

AMA PLASTERING

BILTWELL ROOFING

ALFONSO MEDINA AYALA

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MITCHELL ENVIRONMENTAL CONCRETE INC.

S.B.B. CORPORATION

VALDEZ SIMON JIMENEZ

DARIUSH LAMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HILLSHAFER ROBERT D.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ALBERT S. ISRAEL

CLARK & TREVITHICK

JOHN TAMBORELLI

KAVCIOGLU ARMENAK

LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN E. DEKEL

PALUMBO BERGSTROM LLP

BENTON ORR DUVAL & BUCKINGHAM

RICHARD E. BISHOP LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN TAMBORELLI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2016
  • Notice of Ruling (AT OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE CASE without prejudice ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE TO COMPLAINT AS AGAINST JMS A/C & HEATING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Notice of Ruling (AT OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE TO COMPLAINT AS AGAINST FRANK MARRONE & SONS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY VENTURA CONSTRUCTION, INC. AND DAN LAMY ON 06/24/15 ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY FRANK MARRONE & SONS, INC. ON 08/07/15 ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Notice of Ruling (RE STATUS/CASE MANAGEMENT CON- FERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING ATTY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ) Filed by Former Atty for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default (ITEM #1a IS INCORRECT ITEM #1b IS INCOMPLETE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (DAN LAMY, AN INDIVIDUAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • Affidavit of Prejudice-Peremptory Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Jury Fee Deposit by Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued (RECEIPT: BUR529537011 12-01-14 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.B.B. is a litigant

Latest cases where MITCHELL ENVIRONMENTAL CONCRETE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JMS A/C & HEATING is a litigant