This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 18:06:02 (UTC).

TISA MYLAR VS SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2014 TISA MYLAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANK J. JOHNSON, HOLLY J. FUJIE and HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9576

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FRANK J. JOHNSON

HOLLY J. FUJIE

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MYLAR TISA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

LIAKHOVETSKI OLEG DR.

SAFVATI KAMRAN DR.

SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP

STACIK CINA

TARZANA HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER

TUTTLE SEAN

SEAN TUTTLE AN INDIVIDUAL

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES-ENCINO LLC-DOE2

DR KAMRAN SAFVATI AN INDIVIDUAL

ENCINO HOSPITAL CORPORATION INC. (DOE 1)

CINA STACIK AN INDIVIDUAL

SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP A DELAWA

LIAKHOVETSKI DR. OLEG AN INDIVIDUAL

INDIVIDUAL DR KAMRAN SAFVATI AN

INDIVIDUAL CINA STACIK AN

INDIVIDUAL SEAN TUTTLE AN

LIAKHOVETSKI OLEG M.D.

ENCINO HOSPITAL CORPORATION INC. DOE 1

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KASHFIAN & KASHFIAN LLP

KASHFIAN ESQ. ROBERT A.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BARKUS RAMUNE E. ESQ.

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN & MCKENNA

DERIAN ARMEN G

FRASER STEPHEN C. ESQ.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

PASCALE MATTHEW STEPHEN

TROTTER MICHAEL J. ESQ.

TROTTER MICHAEL JOHN

LIGORSKY BRENDA MARGO

FRASER STEPHEN CLARK

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ELDER ABUSE; ETC

3/17/2014: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ELDER ABUSE; ETC

SUMMONS -

3/17/2014: SUMMONS -

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF PATIENTS RIGHTS, ETC

6/13/2014: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF PATIENTS RIGHTS, ETC

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/18/2014: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/11/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

10/28/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP DBA TARZANA HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER

11/4/2014: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP DBA TARZANA HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER

DEFENDANT SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP DBA TARZANA HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/4/2014: DEFENDANT SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP DBA TARZANA HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/4/2014: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

11/4/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PROOF OF SERVICE RE SIGNED ORDER TO STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP DBA TARZANA HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER

11/21/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE RE SIGNED ORDER TO STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT SSC TARZANA OPERATING COMPANY LP DBA TARZANA HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

11/26/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR REFUND

12/4/2014: REQUEST FOR REFUND

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

12/12/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

12/23/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF HEARING; DEMURRER TO IRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY AMRAN SAFVAII, M.D.; IEMORANDUM OF POINTS ANI) LJTII()RITIES

12/24/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING; DEMURRER TO IRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY AMRAN SAFVAII, M.D.; IEMORANDUM OF POINTS ANI) LJTII()RITIES

OTICE OF HEARING; KAMRAN FVAT1, M.D.?S MOTION TO STRIKE ORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S FIRST MENDED COMPIAINT; FEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND UTII ORITIES

12/24/2014: OTICE OF HEARING; KAMRAN FVAT1, M.D.?S MOTION TO STRIKE ORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S FIRST MENDED COMPIAINT; FEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND UTII ORITIES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

1/15/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by TISA MYLAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by TISA MYLAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Docket(Request-Dismissal); Filed by TISA MYLAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T; (OSC-Dismissal; Not held-Continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department T; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by TISA MYLAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by TISA MYLAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by TISA MYLAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
248 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF PATIENTS RIGHTS, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketSummons-Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. ELDER ABUSE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TISA MYLAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TISA MYLAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCINO HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SSC TARZANA OPERATION G COMPANY LPA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ENCINO HOSPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TARZANA HEALTH AND REHABILITATION CENTER A CORPORATION is a litigant