This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2021 at 05:56:00 (UTC).

TINA ROGERS ET AL VS 3M COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/23/2013 TINA ROGERS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1510

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HOBSON SANDRA

MARINI KENT

ROGERS TINA

Defendants and Respondents

3M COMPANY

CBS CORPORATION

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC

CLEAVER BROOKS INC.

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

CRANE CO.

DAP INC.

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

FRASER'S BOILER SERVICE INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GENERAL FOODS CORPORATION

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC

HENRY COMPANY LLC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

J.T. THORPE & SONS INC.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

MECHANICAL DRIVES & BELTING

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DEBLASE BROWN EYERLY LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

K & L GATES LLP

MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP - LOS ANGELES

WFBM LLP - ORANGE

BERKES CRANE ROBINSON & SEAL LLP

BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

JACKSON JENKINS RENSTROM

LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM ESQ.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

LOGAN LAW GROUP PC

LOMBARDI LOPER & CONANT LLP

NIXON PEABODY LLP

PERKINS COIE LLP

POLSINELLI LLP

POND NORTH LLP

PRINDLE AMARO GOETZ HILLYARD BARNES

WFBM LLP

WFBM LLP ORANGE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

7/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

7/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH I. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

12/23/2013: COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH I. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

SUMMONS -

12/23/2013: SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. (DOE 4)

4/22/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. (DOE 4)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - DEFENDANT DOE 7 EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MOBIL OIL CORPORATION AS TO 2ND CAUSE OF ACTION (PRODUCTS LIABI

5/29/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - DEFENDANT DOE 7 EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MOBIL OIL CORPORATION AS TO 2ND CAUSE OF ACTION (PRODUCTS LIABI

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

8/1/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - SWINERTON BUILDERS

10/6/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - SWINERTON BUILDERS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY

11/5/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - FRASER'S BOILER SERVICE, INC.

11/24/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - FRASER'S BOILER SERVICE, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.

11/26/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

12/15/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - A/T DEFT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

12/30/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - A/T DEFT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal: BC531510-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department Legacy; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. (DOE 4)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.; AS TO THE 2ND COA FOR STRICT LIABILITY ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tina Rogers (Plaintiff); Sandra Hobson (Plaintiff); Kent Marini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH I. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HENRY COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Exxon Mobil Corporation is a litigant