Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2020 at 22:35:00 (UTC).

TIMOTHY RYAN MD VS THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/08/2016 TIMOTHY RYAN MD filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY KEOSIAN, VICTOR E. CHVEZ, WILLIAM A. MACLAUGHLIN and J. STEPHEN CZULEGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6535

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY KEOSIAN

VICTOR E. CHVEZ

WILLIAM A. MACLAUGHLIN

J. STEPHEN CZULEGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RYAN TIMOTHY

RYAN M.D. TIMOTHY

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

DOES 1-25

HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER

WHITE RODNEY. M.D.

WHITE RODNEY. M.D

WHITE M.D

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

QUIGLEY MARK T. ESQ.

QUIGLEY MARK T.

ESNER STUART BRUCE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HAUSMAN JEFFREY M. ESQ.

FENTON HENRY R. ESQ.

HAUSMAN JEFFREY M.

SAVITT LINDA MILLER

FENTON HENRY

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 RE: OTHER LAWSUITS

11/8/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 RE: OTHER LAWSUITS

DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO PRECLUDE OUTCOME OF BERNETTA HIGGINS' SURGERY

4/9/2018: DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO PRECLUDE OUTCOME OF BERNETTA HIGGINS' SURGERY

PLAINTIFF TIMOTHY RYAN, M.D.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO.8; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

4/13/2018: PLAINTIFF TIMOTHY RYAN, M.D.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO.8; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Minute Order -

4/16/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

4/24/2018: Minute Order -

Notice - Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

10/9/2018: Notice - Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

10/18/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/22/2018

10/22/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/22/2018

Notice - Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference

1/29/2019: Notice - Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES 'ANSWER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/21/2019: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES 'ANSWER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/25/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

4/3/2017: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTH

6/29/2017: NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTH

Minute Order -

7/18/2017: Minute Order -

OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE FURTHER DEPOSITION OF RODNEY WHITE, M.D.

8/1/2017: OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE FURTHER DEPOSITION OF RODNEY WHITE, M.D.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

9/29/2017: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET NO.8; DECLARATIONS OF LUIS RODRIGUEZ AND MARK T. QUIGLEY

11/29/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET NO.8; DECLARATIONS OF LUIS RODRIGUEZ AND MARK T. QUIGLEY

RULING RE: DEFENDANT COUNTY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/14/2017: RULING RE: DEFENDANT COUNTY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

339 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • Hearing12/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 89 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 89, William A. MacLaughlin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Status Conference Setting) of 11/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Status Conference Setting)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 89, William A. MacLaughlin, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter: Plaintiff's Application for a Tem...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter: Plaintiff's Application for a Tem...) of 11/19/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 89, William A. MacLaughlin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena Duces Tecum For Trial) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum For Trial) of 08/26/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum For Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
609 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Timothy Ryan, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. RETALIATION IN VIOLATION OF HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE 1278.5; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC606535    Hearing Date: February 22, 2021    Dept: 61


Case Number: BS171831    Hearing Date: February 22, 2021    Dept: 61

Plaintiff James Ware, Jr.’s Motion to Continue Trial is GRANTED. Trial is continued to ____________.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Dr. White is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUIGLEY MARK T.