This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 19:32:26 (UTC).

TIMOTHY POLK, II VS YOVANI GARCIA MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 10/05/2012 TIMOTHY POLK, II filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YOVANI GARCIA MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, ADR NEUTRAL, ELIA WEINBACH and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6904

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

ADR NEUTRAL

ELIA WEINBACH

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POLK TIMOTHY II

Defendants

MARTINEZ YOVANI GARCIA

POZ KELLY (DOE 2)

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

VELASQUEZ MILDRED

Not Classified By Court

WREDE ROBERT K. ESQ.

Others

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

NEWMAN HON. JACK M. (RETIRED)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARPENTER & ZUCKERMAN LLP

Defendant Attorney

VASQUEZ OLIVER J. LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECLASSIFY

7/18/2013: NOTICE OF RULING OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECLASSIFY

ORDER

1/2/2014: ORDER

DEFENDANT?S LIST OF TRIAL EXHIBITS

12/27/2013: DEFENDANT?S LIST OF TRIAL EXHIBITS

Minute Order

7/16/2013: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/25/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF MOTION TO RECLASSIFY UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE TO LIMITED CIVIL CASE; ETC

6/14/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION TO RECLASSIFY UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE TO LIMITED CIVIL CASE; ETC

EX PARTE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF OLIVER J. VASQUEZ; EPROPOSEDI ANSWER AND ORDER

1/2/2014: EX PARTE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF OLIVER J. VASQUEZ; EPROPOSEDI ANSWER AND ORDER

DEFENDANT?S JURY INSTRUCTIONS

12/27/2013: DEFENDANT?S JURY INSTRUCTIONS

Unknown

12/19/2013: Unknown

SUPPLEMENTAL TO NOTICE OF MOTION TO RECLASSIFY UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE TO LIMITED CIVIL CASE; DECLARATION OF MARL K. ZANG; AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT

7/16/2013: SUPPLEMENTAL TO NOTICE OF MOTION TO RECLASSIFY UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE TO LIMITED CIVIL CASE; DECLARATION OF MARL K. ZANG; AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT

Minute Order

6/27/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/2/2014: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS? TRIAL BRIEF

12/27/2013: DEFENDANTS? TRIAL BRIEF

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/16/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT?S REVISED LIST OF TRIAL EXHIBITS

12/31/2013: DEFENDANT?S REVISED LIST OF TRIAL EXHIBITS

Minute Order

7/15/2013: Minute Order

DEFENDANT POZ?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME ON DEFENDANT MARTINEZ?S MOTION TO RECLASSIFY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF OLIVER J. VASQUEZ; DECLARATION OF AURA ARMAS; AN

6/27/2013: DEFENDANT POZ?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME ON DEFENDANT MARTINEZ?S MOTION TO RECLASSIFY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF OLIVER J. VASQUEZ; DECLARATION OF AURA ARMAS; AN

DEFENDANT KELLY POZ? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

6/10/2013: DEFENDANT KELLY POZ? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2014
  • Jury Instructions Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2014
  • List of Exhibits Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2014
  • Brief Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (with prejudice, entire action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Ex-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Order (ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • List of Exhibits (REVISED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • Statement of Case Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • List of Witnesses Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Brief Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2013
  • Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons (& STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.