This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2021 at 15:03:52 (UTC).

TIMOTHY HART VS CITY OF LONG BEACH

Case Summary

On 03/20/2012 TIMOTHY HART filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CITY OF LONG BEACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1175

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HART TIMOTHY

Defendants and Respondents

LONG BEACH CITY OF

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SMITH GREGORY W. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MEYERS BARRY M. SENIOR DEPUTY CITY ATTY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR RETALIATION (LABOR CODE ?1102.5) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/20/2012: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR RETALIATION (LABOR CODE ?1102.5) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS -

3/20/2012: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/21/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH

4/12/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JTJRY

5/21/2012: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JTJRY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/21/2012: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/28/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/10/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

7/13/2012: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Minute Order -

7/13/2012: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/5/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

9/19/2012: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 47; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Timothy Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DocketTRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Long Beach, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketDEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JTJRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Timothy Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR RETALIATION (LABOR CODE 1102.5) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Timothy Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYERS BARRY M. SENIOR DEPUTY CITY ATTY