This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 14:38:18 (UTC).

TIMED OUT LLC VS 11343 PENROSE INC

Case Summary

On 11/02/2016 TIMED OUT LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 11343 PENROSE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9289

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TIMED OUT LLC

Respondents and Defendants

11343 PENROSE INC.

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RENDA LAW OFFICES P.C.

CASAS JOSEPH N.

Defendant Attorney

DIAMOND ROGER JON ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

3/20/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/25/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. STATUTORY MISAPPRPPRATION OF PUBLICITY (CIV. CODE ? 3344); ETC

11/2/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. STATUTORY MISAPPRPPRATION OF PUBLICITY (CIV. CODE ? 3344); ETC

SUMMONS

11/2/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/17/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

2/2/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/2/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/8/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

2/17/2017: Unknown

Proof of Service

2/17/2017: Proof of Service

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/24/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

3/6/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE TO ATTEND TRIAL

9/14/2017: NOTICE TO ATTEND TRIAL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

11/13/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE

12/8/2017: STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE

Minute Order

12/11/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE TO ATTEND TRIAL

12/13/2017: NOTICE TO ATTEND TRIAL

NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

12/18/2017: NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 36; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Timed Out, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • at 08:33 AM in Department 36; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 36; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Timed Out, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. STATUTORY MISAPPRPPRATION OF PUBLICITY (CIV. CODE 3344); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Timed Out, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 11343 PENROSE INC. dba LA VIDA GENTLEMENS CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where Timed Out LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIAMOND ROGER JON