This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2016 00:44:40

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/15/2011 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Tiffany Haddish Stewart against William Stewart in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXX8112
  • Filing Date 07/15/2011
  • Case Status Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge Steinberg, Marjorie
  • Courthouse Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Petitioner Haddish-stewart Tiffany
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Respondent Stewart William
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2013
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment
  • 12/17/2013
  • Judgment
  • 12/04/2013
  • Decl-Deflt or Uncontested Jdgm
  • 11/25/2013
  • Judgment-Package Received-2336
  • 08/20/2013
  • Notice-Change of Address
  • 08/20/2013
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc
  • 08/20/2013
  • Request-Enter Default
  • 08/01/2013
  • Declaration-Income & Expense (per respondent )
  • 08/01/2013
  • Stipulation-Waive Service Dec Disc (per petitioner )
  • 08/01/2013
  • Declaration-Income & Expense (per petitioner )
  • 08/01/2013
  • Declaration-Serv Final Decl of Dis (per respondent )
  • 07/22/2013
  • Declaration-Income & Expense (per respondent )
  • 07/22/2013
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc (per petitioner )
  • 07/22/2013
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc (per respondent )
  • 06/26/2013
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner
  • 11/04/2011
  • Notice-Case Review Re Judgment
  • 09/26/2011
  • Notice-Voiding of Filing
  • 08/24/2011
  • Request- Waive Court Fees Filed by Respondent
  • 08/24/2011
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Respondent
  • 08/24/2011
  • Response Filed by Respondent

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.