This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 18:35:36 (UTC).

THOMAS ALMAGUER VS WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS AND ALMONDS

Case Summary

On 12/15/2016 THOMAS ALMAGUER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS AND ALMONDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1622

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALMAGUER THOMAS

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

WONDER PISTACHIOS AND ALMONDS LLC

CT TRANSPORTATION LLC

PARAMOUNT FARMS INTERNATIONAL LLC

C & T TRUCKING INC.

WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC DBA PARAMOUNT FARMING COMPANY LLC

WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS AND ALMONDS LLC DBA PARAMOUNT FARMS INTERNATIONAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FISHER RICHARD A.

WITZER BRIAN DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

MORAN MATTHEW D.

PETERSON GLENN WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING BINDING ARBITRATION)

7/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING BINDING ARBITRATION)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING BINDING ARBITRATION)

9/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING BINDING ARBITRATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING BINDING ARBITRATION) OF 11/08/2019

11/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING BINDING ARBITRATION) OF 11/08/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING BINDING ARBITRATION)

11/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING BINDING ARBITRATION)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/14/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Petition for Coordination

2/14/2020: Petition for Coordination

Notice of Hearing on Petition

2/14/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING DISMISSAL

2/14/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING DISMISSAL

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MATTHEW MORAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

2/14/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MATTHEW MORAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MATTHEW MORAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING DISMISSAL

2/18/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MATTHEW MORAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING DISMISSAL

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

2/18/2020: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE MOTION AND VACATING DISMISSAL

4/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE MOTION AND VACATING DISMISSAL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO PETITINER'S PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

4/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO PETITINER'S PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

Request for Dismissal

4/7/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/14/2020

5/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/14/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/14/2020

5/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/14/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketJudgment (- Arbitration Award - Before Trial - 07/23/2020 entered for Defendant Wonderful Orchards LLC DBA Paramount Farming Company, LLC against Plaintiff Thomas Almaguer.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Wonderful Orchards LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Petition (to Confirm Arbitration Award) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion - Other (Confirm Arbitration Award) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Wonderful Orchards LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Confirm Arbitration Award)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Thomas Almaguer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Thomas Almaguer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Thomas Almaguer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC641622    Hearing Date: July 22, 2020    Dept: 74

BC641622 THOMAS ALMAGUER vs WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS AND ALMONDS

Defendant’s Unopposed Motion to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is GRANTED.

Case Number: BC641622    Hearing Date: July 20, 2020    Dept: 74

BC641622 THOMAS ALMAGUER vs WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS AND ALMONDS

Defendant Wonderful Orchards’ Unopposed Motion for Order Setting Aside and Vacating Dismissal

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is GRANTED. Petitioner timely brought this motion and had its attorney file a separate declaration where it explained why he failed to appear at the November 8, 2019 OSC re dismissal hearing. Petitioner’s attorney, Matthew Moran states the hearing was not entered in his personal calendaring system, which caused him to fail to appear. He further represents had the hearing appeared on his calendar, he would have attended. (Decl. of Matthew Moran ¶7.)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARAMOUNT FARMS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CT Transportation LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC is a litigant