Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2018 at 09:55:41 (UTC).

THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC VS TWE SOLUTIONS INC

Case Summary

On 12/15/2014 THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against TWE SOLUTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES C. CHALFANT and MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6701

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES C. CHALFANT

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC.

WROAN DAVID

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

BIANCOTTI CHRIS

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

KIELY MICHELLE

MARCATO JOHN

MATTHEWS GERALD

TWE SOLUTIONS INC.

Cross Defendant

CAL NET TECHNOLOLGY GROUPS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANEY & YOUNG LLP

Defendant Attorneys

KILOMETER PARTNERS LLP

HUMPHREY J. SCOTT

Cross Defendant Attorney

NEUFELD TIMOTHY L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/22/2017: Minute Order

CROSS-DEFENDANT DAVID WROAN'S NOTICE OF JOINDER WITH PLAINTIFF THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC.'S MOTION TO TAX AND/OR STRIKE COSTS

2/14/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT DAVID WROAN'S NOTICE OF JOINDER WITH PLAINTIFF THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC.'S MOTION TO TAX AND/OR STRIKE COSTS

STIPULATION AMONG PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT TO CONTINUE DEMURRER HEARING DATE; ORDER

8/28/2015: STIPULATION AMONG PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT TO CONTINUE DEMURRER HEARING DATE; ORDER

DEFENDANTS TWE SOLUTIONS, INC., JOHN MARCATO, CHRISTOPHER BIANCOTTI, GERALD MATTHEWS, MICHELLE KIELY, AND RICARDO MACIAS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD WAIVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICE, INC., AND DAVID WROAN'S C

9/30/2015: DEFENDANTS TWE SOLUTIONS, INC., JOHN MARCATO, CHRISTOPHER BIANCOTTI, GERALD MATTHEWS, MICHELLE KIELY, AND RICARDO MACIAS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD WAIVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICE, INC., AND DAVID WROAN'S C

LAW AND MOTIONS RULINGS

3/2/2016: LAW AND MOTIONS RULINGS

Minute Order

3/2/2016: Minute Order

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS/CROSS-CLAIMANTS? MOTION TO DISQUALIFY HANEY & YOUNG LLP AS COUNSEL TO THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC.

6/10/2016: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS/CROSS-CLAIMANTS? MOTION TO DISQUALIFY HANEY & YOUNG LLP AS COUNSEL TO THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC.

1. PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS DURING PENDENCY OF APPEAL; ETC.

7/13/2016: 1. PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS DURING PENDENCY OF APPEAL; ETC.

NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

7/20/2016: NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' AMENDED OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST CROSS-COMPLAINANTS; ETC

8/26/2016: CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' AMENDED OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST CROSS-COMPLAINANTS; ETC

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

10/12/2016: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

DECLARATION OF NIKKI MA

2/9/2017: DECLARATION OF NIKKI MA

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

2/17/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

PLAINTIFF THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC.'S LIST OF PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

3/9/2017: PLAINTIFF THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC.'S LIST OF PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

Minute Order

3/22/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES ETC.

3/30/2017: DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES ETC.

370 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2018
  • Unknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • at 08:35 AM in Department 34; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Third Wave Technology Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Third Wave Technology Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Third Wave Technology Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
770 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2014
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Declaration; Filed by Twe Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); John Marcato (Defendant); Michelle Kiely (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • DECLARATION OF MICHELLE KIELY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • DECLARATION OF DAVID MICHAELS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY, INC. FOR: (1) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by Third Wave Technology Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); David Wroan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF SHAREHOLDER AGREEMENT AND CONSPIRACY TO BREACH SHAREHOLDER AGREEMENT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEUFELD TIMOTHY L.