This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2019 at 06:16:37 (UTC).

THIRD WAVE TECH SVCS INC ET AL VS TWE SOLUTIONS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2014 THIRD WAVE TECH SVCS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TWE SOLUTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT H. O'BRIEN, JAMES C. CHALFANT, ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE, MICHAEL P. LINFIELD and SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7284

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT H. O'BRIEN

JAMES C. CHALFANT

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC.

WROAN DAVID

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

KIELY MICHELLE

TWE SOLUTIONS INC.

BIANCOTTI CHRISTOPHER

MARCATO JOHN

MACIAS RICARDO

MATTHEWS GERALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANEY & YOUNG LLP

Defendant Attorney

KILOMETER PARTNERS LLP

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR

6/27/2018: REMITTITUR

Minute Order

2/4/2015: Minute Order

APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER, ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

2/4/2015: APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER, ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/23/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/23/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

5/18/2015: Unknown

AMENDED AND REDACTED APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, ETC

6/1/2015: AMENDED AND REDACTED APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, ETC

Minute Order

6/22/2015: Minute Order

(1) DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO COURT'S JUNE 16, 2015 ORDER, ETC.

7/16/2015: (1) DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO COURT'S JUNE 16, 2015 ORDER, ETC.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC. REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT MICHELLE KIELY

8/11/2015: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC. REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT MICHELLE KIELY

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

9/9/2015: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

9/10/2015: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

DEFENDANT TWE'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED FROM ADMISSIONS (CCP SECTION 2033.300(A)); POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DAVID MICHAELS

9/17/2015: DEFENDANT TWE'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED FROM ADMISSIONS (CCP SECTION 2033.300(A)); POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DAVID MICHAELS

RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AFTER HEARING AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (ATTACHMENT)

12/17/2015: RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AFTER HEARING AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (ATTACHMENT)

DECLARATION OF MICHELLE KIELY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER (1) VACATING OR STAYING RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ETC

1/5/2016: DECLARATION OF MICHELLE KIELY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER (1) VACATING OR STAYING RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ETC

ORDER

5/23/2016: ORDER

Minute Order

6/3/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF APPEAL

7/22/2016: NOTICE OF APPEAL

111 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2018
  • Unknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • REMITTITUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • at 08:35 AM in Department 34; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL PER CRC RULE 8.124

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Notice of Appeal; Filed by TWE Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
230 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Third Wave Technology Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); David Wroan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR [X] RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER [X] TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER [X] ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by Third Wave Technology Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); David Wroan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC is a litigant