This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 17:53:46 (UTC).

THEODORE ROUSSOS VS HARRY ROUSSOS ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/18/2012 THEODORE ROUSSOS filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against HARRY ROUSSOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD M. SOHIGIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6762

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ROUSSOS THEODORE

Defendants and Respondents

HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES LLP

HABERBUSH DAVID

ROUSSOS CHRISTINE

ROUSSOS HARRY

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

CLARKSON ROBERT L.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

2/28/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF?S APPLICATION FOR COURT ORDER CONFIRMING INTERIM ARBITRATION RULING OFF CALENDAR

2/14/2013: NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF?S APPLICATION FOR COURT ORDER CONFIRMING INTERIM ARBITRATION RULING OFF CALENDAR

PLAINTIFF?S APPLICATION FOR COURT ORDER CONFIRMING INTERIM ARBITRATION RULING; DECLARATION OF ROBERT L. CLARKSON, ESQ.; PROPOSED ORDER

2/1/2013: PLAINTIFF?S APPLICATION FOR COURT ORDER CONFIRMING INTERIM ARBITRATION RULING; DECLARATION OF ROBERT L. CLARKSON, ESQ.; PROPOSED ORDER

Minute Order -

10/19/2012: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

10/18/2012: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/3/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

8/16/2012: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL

8/16/2012: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/8/2012: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/1/2012: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF RULING OF COURT?S ORDER RE RELATED CASES

7/20/2012: NOTICE OF RULING OF COURT?S ORDER RE RELATED CASES

Minute Order -

7/16/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

7/3/2012: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/19/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

6/18/2012: COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

SUMMONS -

6/18/2012: SUMMONS -

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 41; Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for an Order; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR COURT ORDER CONFIRMING INTERIM ARBITRATION RULING OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR COURT ORDER CONFIRMING INTERIM ARBITRATION RULING; DECLARATION OF ROBERT L. CLARKSON, ESQ.; PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 41; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 41; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 41; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Theodore Roussos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less