Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2021 at 05:38:41 (UTC).

THEE AGUILA INC VS ERDM INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/16/2013 THEE AGUILA INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ERDM INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAUL A. SAHAGUN, ROGER ITO and RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1399

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

ROGER ITO

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Appellants

THEE AGUILA INC

THEE AGUILA INC. A CALIFORNIA

THEE CHATEAU RESTAURANT

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ACUNA SANTIAGO

DOES 1-20

ERDM INC

FRAGOS EDGAR

MENESES EVA

SIMON SECURITY

SIMON SECURITY SERVICES PATROL INC.

FRAGOSO EDGAR

ERDM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FRAGOSO EDGAR AN INDIVIDUAL

SIMON SECURITY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THEE AGUILA INC

AGUILA HENRY

AGUILA HENRY AN INDIVIDUAL

ERDM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THEE AGUILA INC. A CALIFORNIA

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

THEE CHATEAU RESTAURANT

LAMB CYNTHIA

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MALLEY GUINEVERE

LAW OFFICE OF GUINEVERE M. MALLEY

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CENTURY LAW GROUP LLP

DAVIS BREYON J. LAW OFFICES OF

SULLIVAN BALLOG & WILLIAMS LLP

 

Court Documents

Other - - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

11/5/2015: Other - - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Notice of Ruling

12/22/2015: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

3/14/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Substitution of Attorney

4/26/2016: Substitution of Attorney

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT ;B299780, NOA 8/2/19;

9/30/2019: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT ;B299780, NOA 8/2/19;

Minute Order -

11/18/2013: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

12/10/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

12/20/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT, SIMON SECURITY SERVICES PATROL, INC.?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/24/2014: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT, SIMON SECURITY SERVICES PATROL, INC.?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

EX-PARTE MOTION TO CHANGE THE HEARING DATE OF THE DEMURRER FROM MARCH 6, 2014

2/18/2014: EX-PARTE MOTION TO CHANGE THE HEARING DATE OF THE DEMURRER FROM MARCH 6, 2014

REOUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

2/28/2014: REOUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

LWIIRIIARIS? EKLIM, IRU., SANTIAGO ACUNA, EDGAR FRAGOSO, AND EVA MENESES REPLY BRIEF ON PLAINTIF?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER 1NRT?P IFFI1INN MNTINN IN CNNCN1I&IT IN

3/6/2014: LWIIRIIARIS? EKLIM, IRU., SANTIAGO ACUNA, EDGAR FRAGOSO, AND EVA MENESES REPLY BRIEF ON PLAINTIF?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER 1NRT?P IFFI1INN MNTINN IN CNNCN1I&IT IN

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/12/2014: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLM NANT SIMON SECURITY SERVICES PATROL, INC.?S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION, CONTRIBUTION, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF AGAINST ERDM, INC. AND ROES I THROUGH 20

5/12/2014: DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLM NANT SIMON SECURITY SERVICES PATROL, INC.?S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION, CONTRIBUTION, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF AGAINST ERDM, INC. AND ROES I THROUGH 20

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

11/24/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

11/24/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

2/6/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

ANSWER OF HENRY AGUILA TO THE SECOND AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT OF ERDM, INC., EDGAR FRAGOSO, SANTIAGO ACUNA AND EVA MENESES

7/27/2015: ANSWER OF HENRY AGUILA TO THE SECOND AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT OF ERDM, INC., EDGAR FRAGOSO, SANTIAGO ACUNA AND EVA MENESES

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAppeal Document (Order Consolidating Appeals for NOA 8/1/19); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 5 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed 8/2/19); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (NOA 08/02/19 B299780); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketUnknown Document Type: AP642 (;B299780, NOA 8/2/19;); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by THEE AGUILA INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketUnknown Document Type: AP627; Filed by THEE AGUILA INC., a California (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by THEE AGUILA INC., a California (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
299 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by THEE AGUILA INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by THEE AGUILA INC., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT OF THEE AGUILA INC. FOR: 1: NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THEE AGUILA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS BREYON JAHMAI