This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 19:10:45 (UTC).

THEE AGUILA INC VS CALIFORNIA EMINENT DOMAIN LAW GROUP ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/06/2014 THEE AGUILA INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against CALIFORNIA EMINENT DOMAIN LAW GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2354

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

THEE AGUILA INC.

Defendants and Respondents

CALIFORNIA EMINENT DOMAIN LAW GROUP

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

FRAGOSO EDGAR

MANESES EVA

CENTURY LAW GROUP

CONNOLLY TERRENCE M. (DOE 2)

PEDERSEN CHRIS (DOE 1)

Cross Defendant

AGUILA HENRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MALLEY GUINEVERE M.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LARSON KAREN A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND 1ST A-C

3/25/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND 1ST A-C

Unknown

5/5/2014: Unknown

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THE DEMURRER OF THEE AGUILA INC. ECT

2/10/2015: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THE DEMURRER OF THEE AGUILA INC. ECT

Minute Order

6/12/2015: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF KAREN LARSON SUPPORTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS WITH REQUEST FOR AN ORDER STAYING DEPOSITIONS UNTIL DOCUMENTS ARE PRODUCED AND DEPOSITION OF MR. AGUILA SET (AND MOTION FO

8/5/2015: DECLARATION OF KAREN LARSON SUPPORTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS WITH REQUEST FOR AN ORDER STAYING DEPOSITIONS UNTIL DOCUMENTS ARE PRODUCED AND DEPOSITION OF MR. AGUILA SET (AND MOTION FO

FRAGOSO, MENESES, AND CLG'S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT AS PERMITTED BY ORDER OF COURT AUGUST 13, 2015 FOR: 1. ABUSE OF PROCESS 2. FRAUD

8/27/2015: FRAGOSO, MENESES, AND CLG'S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT AS PERMITTED BY ORDER OF COURT AUGUST 13, 2015 FOR: 1. ABUSE OF PROCESS 2. FRAUD

DECLARATION OF CHRIS PEDERSEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND ANTI SLAPP MOTION IN RESPONSE TO BEING SERVED AS A DOE DEFENDANT ON PLAINTIFF'S SECOND VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF PO

2/26/2016: DECLARATION OF CHRIS PEDERSEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND ANTI SLAPP MOTION IN RESPONSE TO BEING SERVED AS A DOE DEFENDANT ON PLAINTIFF'S SECOND VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF PO

PEDERSEN AND CONNOLLY'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

2/26/2016: PEDERSEN AND CONNOLLY'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

OPPOSITION OF THEE AGUILA INC. TO THE ANTI-SLAPP MOTION OF DEFENDANT'S CHRIS PEDERSEN AND TERRENCE CONNOLLY TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/3/2016: OPPOSITION OF THEE AGUILA INC. TO THE ANTI-SLAPP MOTION OF DEFENDANT'S CHRIS PEDERSEN AND TERRENCE CONNOLLY TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF KAREN LARSON IN REBUTTAL TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DOE DEFENDANTS' CONNOLLY AND PEDERSEN'S ANTI SLAPP MOTION PER C.C.P. 430.41

5/9/2016: DECLARATION OF KAREN LARSON IN REBUTTAL TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DOE DEFENDANTS' CONNOLLY AND PEDERSEN'S ANTI SLAPP MOTION PER C.C.P. 430.41

RESPONSE OF THEE AGUILA INC. TO THE REPLY OF DEFENDANT?S CHRIS PEDERSEN AND TERRENCE CONNOLLY TO THE ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

7/22/2016: RESPONSE OF THEE AGUILA INC. TO THE REPLY OF DEFENDANT?S CHRIS PEDERSEN AND TERRENCE CONNOLLY TO THE ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS? PEDERSEN AND CONNOLLY ANTI-SLAPP MOTION ETC.

8/11/2016: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS? PEDERSEN AND CONNOLLY ANTI-SLAPP MOTION ETC.

DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE SUPPORTING THEIR MOTION TO SEVER/BIFURCATE

8/26/2016: DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE SUPPORTING THEIR MOTION TO SEVER/BIFURCATE

JOINT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES FROM OCTOBER 3, 2016 TO OCTOBER 21, 2016

9/21/2016: JOINT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES FROM OCTOBER 3, 2016 TO OCTOBER 21, 2016

DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO ABSENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE FOR ORDER EXCLUDING EXPERT EVIDENCE AT BENCH TRIAL

3/21/2017: DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO ABSENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE FOR ORDER EXCLUDING EXPERT EVIDENCE AT BENCH TRIAL

THEE AGUILA INC.?S EXHIBIT LIST

3/29/2017: THEE AGUILA INC.?S EXHIBIT LIST

THEE AGUILA INC.'S AND HENRY AGUILA'S MOTION FOR RECOSIDERATION OF THE RULING ON THE APRIL 13& 44, 2017 BENCH TRIAL AFTER BIFURICATION

9/11/2017: THEE AGUILA INC.'S AND HENRY AGUILA'S MOTION FOR RECOSIDERATION OF THE RULING ON THE APRIL 13& 44, 2017 BENCH TRIAL AFTER BIFURICATION

DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENT TO THEIR OPPOSITION TO THEE AGUILA'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, REQUESTING THAT COURT STRIKE THE MOTION BASED ON ATTORNEY'S STATE BAR SUSPENSION

10/23/2017: DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENT TO THEIR OPPOSITION TO THEE AGUILA'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, REQUESTING THAT COURT STRIKE THE MOTION BASED ON ATTORNEY'S STATE BAR SUSPENSION

176 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2016
  • Reply to Opposition (TO THEIR DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF THE OPPOSITION TO THE DEMURRER OF CHRIS PEDERSEN AND TERRENCE O'CONNOLLY TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Opposition Document (TO THE DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS CHRIS PEDERSEN AND TERRENCE CONNOLLY TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Answer (TO THE THIRD AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Declaration (OF TERRY CONNOLLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND ANTI SLAPP MOTION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Demurrer (TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Notice of Motion (MOT/STRIKE (ANTI SLAPP) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Declaration (CHRIS PEDERSEN ISO DEMURRER AND ANTI SLAPP TERRY CONNOLLY KAREN LARSON ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Declaration (OF CHRIS PEDERSEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND ANTI SLAPP ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2014
  • Order-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • Request for Judicial Notice (SUPPORTING DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • Demurrer (TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (CALIFORNIA EMINENT DOMAIN LAW GROUP ONLY. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/1961
  • Declaration (OF KAREN LARSON SUPPORTING DEFTS' MOTION TO AMEND SECOND CROSS COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC532354    Hearing Date: February 05, 2020    Dept: 73

2/5/20

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

THEE AGUILA, INC. v. CALIFORNIA EMINENT DOMAIN LAW GROUP, et al.

(BC532354)

DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES ON APPEAL

Moving parties: Defendants Edgar Fragoso, Eva Meneses, dba El Parral

TENTATIVE RULING

Defendants Fragoso and Meneses’ unopposed motion for attorney fees and costs on appeal is GRANTED as prayed in the amount of $60,219.65, payable to defendants Edgar Fragoso and Eva Meneses and their counsel Century Law Group (CLG) and against Plaintiff Thee Aguila Inc.

Discussion

Following the remittitur in this matter on 9/3/19, on 9/18/19 moving parties filed a memorandum of costs on appeal. On 10/10/19 moving parties filed the instant motion for attorney fees.

Defendants Fragoso and Meneses request $60,219.65 in attorney fees and costs as the prevailing parties on appeal. This amount breaks down as follows:

· $42,300 in attorney fees

· $10,575 (a 1.25 multiplier)

· $ 3,600.00 for the fee motion

· $ 3,744.65 in costs

$60,219.65

Fee entitlement

The court refers to a previous fee award regarding the moving parties’ entitlement to attorney fees.

Lodestar analysis

Hourly rate. The court is cognizant of its previous fee award in this case based on an hourly rate of of $450 per hour. That hourly rate is what moving parties request; it remains within the reasonable range here for the appellate work and is more than reasonable.

Hours. Counsel has adequately supported the 94 hours expended for the appeal and 8 hours for the fee motion.

Lodestar. The lodestar is based on 102 hours @ $450 per hour for a total of $45,900.

Multiplier. The court agrees with moving parties that a multiplier is appropriate given the complexities of the appeal and the complete success the El Parral defendants achieved resulting in a published opinion. The court finds that a multiplier of 1.25 is appropriately applied on the 94 hours.

Costs : Awarded as prayed in the amount of $3,744.65.

Moving parties to e-file a proposed order and give notice of ruling.