This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2016 at 20:06:59 (UTC).

THE PROMOTION BY DANIEL LIEF VS. MISCHA BARTON ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2014 THE PROMOTION BY DANIEL LIEF filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MISCHA BARTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY L. NEWMAN and H. CHESTER HORN, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2965

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

NANCY L. NEWMAN

H. CHESTER HORN, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROMOTION BY DANIEL LIEF THE

Defendants

BARTON MISCHA

MANIA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAKIM HAKIM G.

GARLAND KEVIN M.

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID M. DUSHANE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2016
  • Order (GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL MISCHA BARTON ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Order (GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSE - MANIA INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Declaration Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (FOR DEFT. MANIA, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFTS. MISCHA BARTON & MANIA, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (FOR DEFT. MISCHA BARTON ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Points and Authorities Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Former Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • Notice-Case Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • Motion for an Order (ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS AND FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFT, ETC... ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC122965    Hearing Date: October 31, 2019    Dept: P

 

The Promotion by Daniel Lief v. Mischa Barton et al., Case No. SC122965

Motion for Assignment Order

Hearing Date: 10/31/19

The court’s tentative ruling posted on 8/20/19 and reflected in the 8/20/19 minute order is the court’s tentative ruling for 10/31/19.