This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2020 at 16:34:31 (UTC).

THE PREMAE COMPANY LLC ET AL VS FINANCE CALIFORNIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2011 THE PREMAE COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against FINANCE CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE and ANN I. JONES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2942

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DEHAVEN JEFFREY

PREMAE COMPANY LLC THE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

FINANCE CALIFORNIA

WIENER GERALD H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEE RAYMOND A.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GLASER WEIL FINK JACOBS HOWARD ET AL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) FRAUD AND DECEIT; ETC.

6/6/2011: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) FRAUD AND DECEIT; ETC.

Minute Order -

6/6/2011: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF RAYMOND LEE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EXPI4RTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENJOINING THE SALE OR DIS

6/6/2011: DECLARATION OF RAYMOND LEE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EXPI4RTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENJOINING THE SALE OR DIS

DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RISTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

6/6/2011: DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RISTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

DECLARATION OF REID BREITMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

6/6/2011: DECLARATION OF REID BREITMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

DECLARATION OF KARYN MELETIS RELATING TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAIMNG ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

6/6/2011: DECLARATION OF KARYN MELETIS RELATING TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAIMNG ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

DECLARATION OF GERALD H. WIENER IN SUPPORT OF I)EFENDANT FINANCE CALIFORNIAS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNC

6/6/2011: DECLARATION OF GERALD H. WIENER IN SUPPORT OF I)EFENDANT FINANCE CALIFORNIAS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNC

PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE ENJOINING THE SALE OR DISPOSITION OF COLLATERAL, AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORI)ER ENJOINING TILE

6/6/2011: PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE ENJOINING THE SALE OR DISPOSITION OF COLLATERAL, AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORI)ER ENJOINING TILE

DECLARATION OF ROBERT F. ADEL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EXPARTE APPLICATION

6/10/2011: DECLARATION OF ROBERT F. ADEL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EXPARTE APPLICATION

DECLARATION OF KEVIN .J. LEICHTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

6/10/2011: DECLARATION OF KEVIN .J. LEICHTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

6/10/2011: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT R

6/10/2011: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT R

Minute Order -

6/10/2011: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING DENYING PLAINTIFFS SECOND EXPI1RTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

6/13/2011: NOTICE OF RULING DENYING PLAINTIFFS SECOND EXPI1RTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

NOTICE OF RULING DENYING PLAINTIFFS EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

6/13/2011: NOTICE OF RULING DENYING PLAINTIFFS EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/20/2011: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

7/21/2011: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

7/27/2011: Minute Order -

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2011
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 69; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • Docketat 08:00 AM in Department 69; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • Docketat 08:00 am in Department 69, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Premae Company, LLC, The (Plaintiff); Jeffrey Dehaven (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketDEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RISTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE ENJOINING THE SALE OR DISPOSITION OF COLLATERAL, AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORI)ER ENJOINING THE SALE OR DISPOSITION OF COLLATERAL PENDING THE O.S.CI HEA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINANCE CALIFORNIA is a litigant