This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2019 at 23:34:32 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS PEDRO GALLEGOS VEGA

Case Summary

On 03/29/2012 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against PEDRO GALLEGOS VEGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSS KLEIN and JOSEPH E. DILORETO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7369

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSS KLEIN

JOSEPH E. DILORETO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

CAL

CALIFORNIA RECOVEYANCE COMPANY

CITIMORTGAGE INC.

DOE ONE TO DOE TWENTY

GENERAL TELEPHONE COMPANY SUCCESSOR

GREAT WESTERN BANK

NOEMI BERMUDEZ VEGA WIFE

PEDRO GALLEGOS VEGA HUSBAND

SOUTHERN CALIFONRIA EDISON COMPANY

VERIZON CALIFORNIA

(DOE 1) GEORGE VEGA

(DOE 2) ANGELA VEGA

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. DOE 3

CAL-WESTERN RECOVEYANCE CORPORATION

DOE 2 ANGELA VEGA

DOE 1 GEORGE VEGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMANDA DEJESUS DEPUTY ATTORNEY

Defendant Attorneys

MALCOM & CISNEROS

RICHARD D. ARKO STATE BAR NO. 198236

SULLIVAN TAKETA LLP

VICTORIA E. ADAMS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2014
  • Request; Filed by THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Request (AND ORDER FOR RELEASE OF DEPOSIT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • Order (FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION AND WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS DECL OF ROBERT A BAGGS IN SUPP THEREOF ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • at 08:30 am in Department SOS27, Ross Klein, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg. (1- DEFAULT PACKET AS TO GEORGE & ANGELA VEGA2- JUDGMENT AND/OR DISMISSAL AS REMAINING DEFTS) - OSC held & continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • Judgment (FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (PLNTF- PEOPLE OF STATE OF CA PARTIAL DISM WITHOUT PREJ AS TO DEFT PEDRO GALLEGOS VEGA ( comp ) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (PLNTF- STATE OF CALIF WITHOUT PREJ AS TO DEFT NOEMI BERMUDEZ VEGA ONLY ( COMP ) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: VERIZON CALIFORNIA INC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: NOEMI BERMUDEZ VEGA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: PEDRO GALLEGOS VEGA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • Summons; Filed by THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • Complaint; Filed by THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • Complaint Filed (SUMMONS ISSUED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Great Western Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CAL AGENTS REALTY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE LLC is a litigant