Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2016 at 14:14:10 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS CARMENITA SFS PRO

Case Summary

On 06/07/2011 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CARMENITA SFS PRO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSS KLEIN, CAROLYN B. KUHL, TERRY A. GREEN and JOSEPH E. DILORETO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6147

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSS KLEIN

CAROLYN B. KUHL

TERRY A. GREEN

JOSEPH E. DILORETO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

AAA - FLAG AND BANNER

AAA-FLAG AND BANNER

BAEK SAN NATURAL HERB INC.

BIF USA INC.

BUCHELI CABINETS

CALVARY BLESSED CHURCH

CANSECO BOILER SERVICE

CANSECO BOILER SERVICES

CARMENITA SFS PROPERTY LLC

CERRITOS HARVEST CHURCH

CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS

COMPLETE PRINTING SOLUTIONS INC.

CONTRACTORS CAREER CENTERS INC.

COOPER CRAIG B

CRAIG B. COOPER TRUSTEE

CYGNUM GROUP INC.

DAMOA PRODUCTIONS INC.

DAMOA PRODUCTIONS INCORPORATED

DOE ONE TO DOE ONE HUNDRED INCLUSIVE

53 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILLIAM T. KAMIZOLAS

KAMIZOLAS WILLIAM T. ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

FISHER J. JAMIE

PARRILLE ANTHONY P.

DUFFY & WOOG

KROESCHE THOMAS

CHUGH FIRM (NAVNEET S CHUGH )

DITONTO DOUGLAS P. ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF GARY BYRON ROACH APC

MURPHY JOHN CLARK

DELORME LISA ESQ.

CENTURY LAW GROUP ( KAREN LARSEN )

GONZALES MICHAEL ESQ.

GUNDY CHRISTOPHER VAN

MURPHY & EVERTZ LLP

MADUENO EMILY L.

JAVAHERI MICHAEL

LISA DELORME

FISHER & TALWAR

ANTHONY P. PARRILE & ASSOCIATES

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/14/2011: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/23/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/23/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/7/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/7/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/21/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/21/2011: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/2/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/2/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DISCLAIMER FOR DEFENDANT ROLL PROPERTIES INTERNATIONAL, INC.

8/8/2011: DISCLAIMER FOR DEFENDANT ROLL PROPERTIES INTERNATIONAL, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/16/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

8/23/2011: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/28/2011: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/5/2011: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/5/2011: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/5/2011: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

WRIT OF ASSISTANCE

2/2/2012: WRIT OF ASSISTANCE

STIPULATION TO TRANSFER CASI NUMBERS NC 056147 AND BC 462846 TO DEPARTMENT J OF TI-FE SOUTH DISTRICT, LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT PURSUANT TO JUDGE GREEN?S INSTRUCTIONS AND SUPERVISING JUDGE KUIIL?S OR

2/17/2012: STIPULATION TO TRANSFER CASI NUMBERS NC 056147 AND BC 462846 TO DEPARTMENT J OF TI-FE SOUTH DISTRICT, LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT PURSUANT TO JUDGE GREEN?S INSTRUCTIONS AND SUPERVISING JUDGE KUIIL?S OR

136 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2015
  • Judgment (FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Order (FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • Disclaimer (M/P D SOLRAC, LLC, ET AL. ATTY- G. B. ROACH ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • Satisfaction of Judgment (PLNTF- STATE OF CA SATISFACTION OF JDUGMENT FULL BY DEBTOR = PEOPLE OF STATE OF CA THRU DOT TO CREDITOR- CARMENITA SFS PROEPRT LLC ( SIGNED BY DEFT ROLL LAW AT) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • Satisfaction of Judgment (PLNTF - STATE OF CALIF. FULL SATISFACTION OF JDUGMENT AS TO CREDITOR - RESNICK 2009 FAMI LY TRUST AS TO DEBTOR = PEOPLE OF STATE OF CA DOT SIGNED BY DEFT CNSL ROLL LA) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • Satisfaction of Judgment (PLNTF- PEOPLE O FSTATE OF CA ACK OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT RE FULL SATISFACTIN CREDITOR - MAVINS OFFICE FURNITURE AS TO DEBTOR - DEPT OF TRANS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • Satisfaction of Judgment (PLNTF -STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACK OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT -FULL AS TO STATE OF CALIF CREDITOR - 1ST IMPERIAL TRADING ..) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Ex-Parte Application ((JOINT) EPA FOR ORDER TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR IN INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT AND TO AMEND INTERLOCUTRY JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTH'S; DECL. OF JULIE DEL RIVO AND SHERWOOD TUNG IN SUP) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Judgment (AMENDED INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION B/T PLTF AND DEFT FIRST IMPERIAL TRADING CORP., DBA HALLOWEEN CLUB ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • Stipulation (FOR INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION BY & B/T PLTF & DEFTS FIRST IMPERIAL TRADING CORP. DBA HALLOWEEN CLUB ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
362 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2011
  • Stipulation and Order (Carmenita sfs extend time to file response ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • Amended Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: BIF USA, INC. PERSON SERVED; THOMAS LEE, SALESPERSON ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS PERSON SERVED: ANITA JIMENEZ, DEPUTY CITY CLERK ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: QUALITY ENVIRONMENTAL, INC PERSON SERVED: QUALITY ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PTY SERVED: CARMENITA SFS PROPERTY LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, FORMERLY ROLL PROPERTIES INTERNTION PERSON SERVED: EMILY MADUENO, MURPHY & EVERTZ, ATTY FOR GRANTOR) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • Complaint Filed (SUMMONS ISSUED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/1971
  • Notice (FAD - FISHER & TALWAR (J FISHER) ( PREV ATTY MAVINS OFFICE FURN) - NOTICE OF RELEASE OF LIEN X) Filed by Former Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISHER J. JAMIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUNDY, CHRISTOPHER VAN