This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 00:10:31 (UTC).

THE PALADIN GROUP VS STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 02/08/2016 THE PALADIN GROUP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4735

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PALADIN GROUP INCORPORATED

Defendant

STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID B. BLOOM

PARK & LIM

Defendant Attorneys

MARK E. BRENNER

BRENNER MARK E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2018
  • at 4:00 PM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • at 04:00 pm in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) (CLERK'S VERIFICATION FILING OFBRIEF BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSELRE STAY AND REQUEST FORCONTINUANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOREXAMINATION) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Notice of Stay (OF PROCEEDINGS ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address (OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by THE PALADIN GROUP INCORPORATED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by THE PALADIN GROUP INCORPORATED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by THE PALADIN GROUP INCORPORATED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2016
  • Notice of Application; Filed by THE PALADIN GROUP INCORPORATED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Application - Miscellaneous (FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by THE PALADIN GROUP INCORPORATED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Declaration (OF BRIAN SCANE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Notice of Application (AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Application ; Filed by THE PALADIN GROUP INCORPORATED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by THE PALADIN GROUP INCORPORATED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Summons; Filed by THE PALADIN GROUP INCORPORATED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued (- VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND FOR MONEY - RECEIPT: GLN538418007 02-08-16); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant