This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 01:20:00 (UTC).

THE MAHR GROUP LLC VS DANIEL T PIERSON

Case Summary

On 02/08/2016 THE MAHR GROUP LLC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against DANIEL T PIERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9445

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAHR GROUP LLC THE

Defendant

PIERSON DANIEL T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CUNNEEN DAWN HALL ESQ

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

REINIS MITCHELL N. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

6/6/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FOLLOWING SUSTAINING OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

5/27/2016: JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FOLLOWING SUSTAINING OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

Minute Order

5/24/2016: Minute Order

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

5/24/2016: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

REPLY POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

5/17/2016: REPLY POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

5/11/2016: OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

DECLARATION OF JESS R. BOOTH IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

5/11/2016: DECLARATION OF JESS R. BOOTH IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

5/5/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Minute Order

4/14/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF HEARING AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

3/17/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DECLARATION OF MITCHELL N. REINIS RE DEMURRER AND REQUESTING JUDICIAL NOTICE

3/17/2016: DECLARATION OF MITCHELL N. REINIS RE DEMURRER AND REQUESTING JUDICIAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/9/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/1/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

2/26/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/24/2016: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

SUMMONS

2/8/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

2/8/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2016
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FOLLOWING SUSTAINING OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Sustained) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketStipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketREPLY POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketReply/Response; Filed by Daniel T. Pierson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Mahr Group, LLC, The (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Mahr Group, LLC, The (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Mahr Group, LLC, The (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mahr Group, LLC, The (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

j—y

e 0 g & U & W

v 24 e

TY1r oz owonet o TRULCT v

* Onigng ®

THOMPSON COBURN LLP

MITCHELL N. REINIS, CSB 36131 - msGtonpmeoburion RECENTL FILED Los Angeles, California 90067 MAY 25 2[]1l§ountv of Los Angeles Tel: 310.282.2500 / Fax: 310.282.2501 WAY 2 5 2016 MAY 2% 2018 Attorneys for Defendant, Daniel T. Pierson, Sherri R, Carter, Executive Officer\Clgrk Administrator Bymaemna 7= Deputy

PREJUDICE FOLLOWING SUSTAINING

DANIEL T. PIERSON, Administrator of the OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT Estate of James Brand Hall; and DOES 1 to WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

100, inclusive, DATE: November 24, 2016 Defendants. TIME: 9:30 a.m. DEPT.: 12

Complaint Filed: Februarv 8. 2016

Having sustained the demurrer of defendant, Daniel T. Pierson, Administrator of the Estate | of James Brand Hall to the complaint filed by plaintiff, The Mahr Group, LLC, without leave to ' amend, the Court hereby dismisses this action with prejudice in its entirety. Defendant is the |

prevailing party and entitled to recover costs of suit in the sum of § : ;

DATED: May%Z 2016

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAHR GROUP LLC THE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cunneen, Dawn Hall