This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:54:22 (UTC).

THE MAHR GROUP LLC VS DANIEL T PIERSON

Case Summary

On 02/08/2016 THE MAHR GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DANIEL T PIERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KEVIN C. BRAZILE and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9444

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MAHR GROUP LLC THE

Defendants and Respondents

PIERSON DANIEL T.

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CUNNEEN DAWN HALL ESQ

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

REINIS MITCHELL N. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

2/8/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT AND (2) MONEY LENT

2/8/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT AND (2) MONEY LENT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/9/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/24/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/24/2016: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/24/2016: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

ANSWER OF DANIEL T. PIERSON TO COMPLAINT

3/16/2016: ANSWER OF DANIEL T. PIERSON TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/18/2016: Minute Order

Unknown

5/13/2016: Unknown

Unknown

5/23/2016: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

6/7/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

6/7/2016: Minute Order

Proof of Service

7/14/2016: Proof of Service

Minute Order

12/15/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

1/9/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/23/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE

1/23/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE

2/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 31; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT AND (2) MONEY LENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Mahr Group, LLC, The (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAHR GROUP LLC THE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cunneen, Dawn Hall