This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 09:51:29 (UTC).

THE HERTZ CORPORATION VS. JONATHAN LIGONS

Case Summary

On 08/19/2016 THE HERTZ CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JONATHAN LIGONS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8531

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HERTZ CORPORATION A CORPORATION

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

JONATHAN LIGONS

LIGONS JONATHAN

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAINES TODD F. LAW OFFICES

HAINES TODD FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

Summons

8/19/2016: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/19/2016: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document

9/7/2016: Legacy Document

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/6/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Case Management Statement

1/12/2017: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document

1/31/2017: Legacy Document

Minute Order

4/13/2017: Minute Order

Legacy Document

5/26/2017: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

10/23/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

3/1/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

4/23/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

6/6/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

8/6/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

8/8/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

8/17/2018: Legacy Document

Witness List

2/19/2019: Witness List

Minute Order

2/25/2019: Minute Order

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Witness List; Filed by THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Notice; Filed by THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Answer; Filed by JONATHAN LIGONS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by JONATHAN LIGONS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by JONATHAN LIGONS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by THE HERTZ CORPORATION, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: TC028531    Hearing Date: August 06, 2020    Dept: A

# 10. The Hertz Corporation v. Jonathan Ligons

Case No.: TC028531

Matter on calendar for: Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement

Tentative ruling:

  1. Background

In this breach of contract action plaintiff The Hertz Corporation alleges it entered into a vehicle rental agreement with defendant Jonathan Ligons. The agreement obligated Ligons to pay for damages to the rental vehicle, regardless of fault. Ligons failed to tender the alleged $95,148.00 owed. Ligons is self-represented.

The parties entered into a settlement agreement and requested that the Court retain jurisdiction to enforce it under Code of Civil Procedure § 664.6.

Hertz now moves the Court to vacate the dismissal and enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement agreement. (Minute Order, February 25, 2019.)

The motion is unopposed.

For the reasons set forth below, the Court grants the motion.

  1. Standard

Code of Civil Procedure § 664.6 “explicitly provides statutory authorization for the entry of judgment upon a stipulated settlement by means of a noticed motion.” (Casa de Valley View Owner’s Assn. v. Stevenson (1985) 167 Cal.App.3d 1182, 1189.) The Court may determine the motion upon declarations alone in ruling. (Corkland v. Boscoe (1984) 156 Cal.App.3rd 989, 994) Where the settlement is ambiguous, the Court is required to consider extrinsic evidence of the parties’ intent. (Steller v. Sears, Roebuck & Co. (2010) 189 Cal.App.4th 175, 183).

  1. Analysis

    Under the terms of the settlement agreement, Ligons agreed to make monthly payments of $50 from March 30, 2019, to February 28, 2044. (Exh. A., ¶ 2.) Ligon made payments totaling $300 but has failed to pay any further sums after October 30, 2019. (Decl. Tapper, ¶ 5.) He has breached the settlement agreement and the entry of judgment on its terms is appropriate.

  2. Ruling

    The motion is granted. Plaintiff to submit a proposed order to the Court.

    Next dates:

    Notice: