This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2019 at 18:55:08 (UTC).

THE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY VS MADELLIN SOLIS ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/18/2016 THE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against MADELLIN SOLIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1179

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY THE

THE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A COMPANY OF FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Respondents and Appellants

SOLIS MADELLIN

REYNOSO ARACELY MORENO

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

BOYER BRADLEY

THE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A COMPANY OF FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

Minors

A.R.

R.R.

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

GUERRERO ALEX D

Defendant Attorney

MCELROY STEPHEN KELLY

Respondent Attorney

GUERRERO ALEX D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/12/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/26/2019: Minute Order

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/2/2018: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order

2/2/2018: Minute Order

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/26/2018: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

REPLY AND NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION IN SUPPORT OF SKY UK LIMITEDS MOTION TO QUASH, ETC

6/26/2018: REPLY AND NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION IN SUPPORT OF SKY UK LIMITEDS MOTION TO QUASH, ETC

DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS M. GEDO SUPPORTING REPLY TO SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH

7/30/2018: DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS M. GEDO SUPPORTING REPLY TO SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JOSH M. DO WELL IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO SKY UK LIMITED?S MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/31/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JOSH M. DO WELL IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO SKY UK LIMITED?S MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

10/30/2018: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Proof of Personal Service

4/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

11/30/2016: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEPOSIT FUNDS BY STAKEHOLDER AND DECLARATION OF STEPHEN MCELROY

12/6/2016: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEPOSIT FUNDS BY STAKEHOLDER AND DECLARATION OF STEPHEN MCELROY

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

12/8/2016: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Minute Order

1/12/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

5/10/2017: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order

7/11/2017: Minute Order

SKY UK LIMITED'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE A MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION ETC

11/9/2017: SKY UK LIMITED'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE A MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION ETC

Minute Order

12/11/2017: Minute Order

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • Hearing10/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Status Conference); Filed by R.R. (Legacy Party); A.R. (Legacy Party); Madellin Solis (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Status Conference); Filed by R.R. (Legacy Party); A.R. (Legacy Party); Aracely Moreno Reynoso (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Madellin Solis (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Madellin Solis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Status Conference); Filed by Madellin Solis (Defendant); Aracely Moreno Reynoso (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
201 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The American Insurance Company, A Company of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The American Insurance Company, A Company of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC631179    Hearing Date: February 19, 2021    Dept: 17

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

DEPARTMENT 17

TENTATIVE RULING

MADELLIN SOLIS, et al.

vs.

ATTACK ADS, INC., et al.

Case No.: BC631179

(Consolidated with BC642838)

Hearing Date: February 19, 2021

This case arises out of a 2015 car accident. Plaintiff Madellin Solis (Solis) suffered multiple traumatic injuries, and was left with both mental and physical disabilities as a result of the collision. Eight-year-old Plaintiff Adreil Reynoso (Adriel Reynoso) suffered minor trauma injuries, but has experienced lingering anxiety during the 1 to 2 years following the incident.

Plaintiffs now petition to confirm two compromises: (1) a compromise for persons with a disability (Solis); and (2) a minor’s compromise (Adriel Reynoso).

Plaintiffs now seek approval of a $1,050,000.00 total settlement. Of the settlement proceeds, Solis is to receive $690,000, and Adriel Reynoso is to receive $10,000. Additional Plaintiffs will receive the remaining settlement balance.

After a review of the petitions and attached documentation, subject to the Court’s statutory inquiry, the requests for orders confirming the minor’s and person with a disability’s compromises could be granted.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.R. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases where R.R. is a litigant