This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2016 at 08:30:53 (UTC).

TETSUSHI T. OKIMOTO ET. AL. VS. MEHRAM BAHERI ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2012 TETSUSHI T OKIMOTO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MEHRAM BAHERI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIA WEINBACH, AMY D. HOGUE, LIA MARTIN and NORMAN P. TARLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9421

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIA WEINBACH

AMY D. HOGUE

LIA MARTIN

NORMAN P. TARLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

OKIMOTO SHARON M.

OKIMOTO TETSUSHI T.

Defendants and Respondents

ANAHITA BAHERIKOLEKHANEH

BAHERI MEHRAM

Other

PALUMBO BRUCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CELLI THOMAS M.

AMMIRATO VINCENT A.

PALUMBO BRUCE ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS M. CELLI

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

EARLY MASLACH & HARTSUYKER

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/23/2013: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

4/23/2013: Unknown

Unknown

6/7/2013: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/17/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

MINUTES

6/20/2013: MINUTES

NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

6/21/2013: NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

Unknown

5/8/2014: Unknown

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

5/22/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92,93, 97)

6/27/2014: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92,93, 97)

NOTICE OF P1 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

7/28/2014: NOTICE OF P1 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

8/1/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

8/6/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

Minute Order

9/3/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

9/8/2014: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

MOTION IN LIMINE #3 AND ORDER TO EXCLUDE DOCUMENTS AND WITNESSES NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY

12/1/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE #3 AND ORDER TO EXCLUDE DOCUMENTS AND WITNESSES NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY

MOTION IN LIMINE #1 AND ORDER TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF INSURANCE

12/1/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE #1 AND ORDER TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF INSURANCE

MOTION IN LIMINE #2 AND ORDER TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF?S POVERTY OR DEFENDANT?S WEALTH

12/1/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE #2 AND ORDER TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF?S POVERTY OR DEFENDANT?S WEALTH

PLAINTIFFS SHARON AND TETSUSHI OKIMOTO'S POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIIFS' MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

3/16/2015: PLAINTIFFS SHARON AND TETSUSHI OKIMOTO'S POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIIFS' MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs ($1031.02 MEMO FORWARDED TO CCW COURTHOUSE, DEPT 315 FOR PROCESSING ON 3/19/15 MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL SET FOR 03/20/15 IN DEPT 315. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Motion for New Trial (PLTF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ADDITUR, or in the alternative MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ON DAMAGES (Date Cleared w/Court on 2-4-15) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Judgment Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Stipulation (STIPULATION IN THE MATTER OF OKIMOTO V. BAHERI - READ IN OPEN COURT IN THE PRESENCE OF THE JURY JOINT STIPULATION BY ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT ) Filed by Joined Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT SLIP FOR PAYMENT OF JURY FEES BY DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL FOR THE DATE OF 1-16-15 (2ND. DAY OF JURY TRIAL) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Stipulation and Order (STIP/ORDER TO USE A CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER, KATY JACKSON, CSR #12680 PAID BY DEFENSE COUNSEL ONLY. (GRANTED BY THE COURT 1-15-15) ) Filed by Requestor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Statement of Case (filed jointly by pltfs. and deft. counsel ) Filed by Joined Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • List of Exhibits (filed jointly by pltfs. and deft. counsel ) Filed by Joined Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Motion for an Order (Motion in Limine #2 and order to exclude evidence of plaintiff's poverty or defendant's wealth *not in proper format* Heard as a motion for an order ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Brief (Plaintiff's Trial Brief ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2013
  • Notice of Lodging (OF DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF REPLY BRIEF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Notice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLTF TO GIVE NOTICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PLTFS COUNSEL BRUCE PALUMBO ATTY FOR PLTFS FROM 5-27-13 - 6-10-13 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice-Case Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • Notice of Association of Attorneys Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less